Aslam v. United States Department of State et al
Plaintiff: Muhammad Aqueel Aslam and Muhammad Aqeel Aslam
Defendant: United States Department of State, United States Embassy in Islamabad, Antony J Blinken and Donald Blome
Case Number: 2:2022cv00701
Filed: November 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Daphne A Oberg
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Review Agency Decision
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 DOCKET TEXT ORDER: The deadlines in paragraphs 1 and 2 of the #3 Order to Propose Schedule shall run from the date of the first appearance by a defendant in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 12/8/2022. No attached document.(med)
November 18, 2022 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Muhammad Aqeel Aslam. Antony J Blinken served on 11/14/2022, answer due 1/13/2023; Donald Blome served on 11/14/2022, answer due 1/13/2023; United States Department of State served on 11/14/2022, answer due 1/13/2023; United States Embassy in Islamabad served on 11/14/2022, answer due 1/13/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit mail receipts, #2 Exhibit court issued summonses)(Hacking, James)
November 8, 2022 Filing 12 Summons Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney Trina A. Higgins. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (haa)
November 8, 2022 Filing 11 Summons Issued Electronically as to United States Embassy in Islamabad, Pakistan. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (haa)
November 8, 2022 Filing 10 Summons Issued Electronically as to United States Department of State. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (haa)
November 8, 2022 Filing 9 Summons Issued Electronically as to Attorney General Merrick Garland. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (haa)
November 8, 2022 Filing 8 Summons Issued Electronically as to Donald Blome, Ambassador of the United States at the U.S. Embassy in Islamabad, Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (haa)
November 8, 2022 Filing 7 Summons Issued Electronically as to Antony J Blinken, United States Secretary of State. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (haa)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney James O. Hacking, III for Muhammad Aqeel Aslam.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 11/07/2022. (mh)
November 4, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of James O. Hacking, III , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4497595,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Muhammad Aqeel Aslam. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hamilton, R.)
November 4, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney James O. Hacking, III, for Plaintiff Muhammad Aqeel Aslam. (haa)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 11/4/2022. (alf)
November 3, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4496799) filed by Muhammad Aqueel Aslam. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hamilton, R.)
November 3, 2022 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg. Plaintiff Muhammad Aqueel Aslam is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (haa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aslam v. United States Department of State et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Muhammad Aqueel Aslam
Represented By: R. Blake Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Muhammad Aqeel Aslam
Represented By: R. Blake Hamilton
Represented By: James O. Hacking, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Embassy in Islamabad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antony J Blinken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Blome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?