Gifford v. Dr Pizza et al
Plaintiff: Shannon Gifford
Defendant: Dr Pizza and David Kearns
Case Number: 2:2022cv00707
Filed: November 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 0201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Kimberly Medina, for Defendants Dr Pizza, David Kearns. (alf)
December 13, 2022 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Shannon Gifford as to All Defendants. (McCarley, Matthew)
November 15, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to David Kearns. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (ks)
November 15, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Dr Pizza. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (ks)
November 14, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of PLAINTIFFS CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Shannon Gifford (McCarley, Matthew)
November 8, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4500324) filed by Shannon Gifford. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (McCarley, Matthew)
November 8, 2022 Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead added. Case number will now read 2:22-cv-00707-DBP. Please make changes to document captions accordingly. (ks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gifford v. Dr Pizza et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Gifford
Represented By: Matthew Ryan McCarley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Pizza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Kearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?