Salas v. St. Pierre
Plaintiff: Julian Salas
Defendant: Diane L. St. Pierre
Case Number: 2:2024cv00211
Filed: March 20, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: David Barlow
Referring Judge: Jared C Bennett
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal- Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: granting #12 Motion for Scheduling Order Amended Pleadings due by 7/26/2024. Joinder of Parties due by 7/26/2024. Expert Discovery due by 6/4/2025. Motions due by 7/4/2025. Scheduling Conference set for 7/9/2025 at 03:00 PM in Rm 8.100 before Judge David Barlow. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 05/14/2024. (kpf)
May 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate Judge to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Motions referred to Jared C. Bennett. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 5/14/2024. (jal)
May 7, 2024 Filing 12 Stipulated MOTION for Scheduling Order filed by Defendant Diane L. St. Pierre. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attorney Planning Meeting Report)(Knight, Jeremy)
April 12, 2024 Filing 11 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Scheduling Order)(Knight, Jeremy)
April 12, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth I. Denos Richard Gray on behalf of Julian Salas (Denos, Kenneth) Modified to correct Richard Gray appearance party on 4/23/2024 (kpf).
March 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DOCKET TEXT ORDER. No attached document. On March 25, 2024 Plaintiff filed a #8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A). However, the same day, Defendant filed an #7 Answer. Voluntary dismissal under Rule 41(a)(1)(A) requires either a stipulated dismissal or a notice of dismissal before an answer is filed. Accordingly, since Defendant had already filed his Answer, Plaintiff's Notice is without effect. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 3/26/2024. (jal)
March 25, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of DIANE L. ST. PIERRE filed by Plaintiff Julian Salas (Denos, Kenneth)
March 25, 2024 Filing 7 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint and Reliance on Jury Demand filed by Diane L. St. Pierre.(Knight, Jeremy)
March 22, 2024 Filing 6 RECEIVED Magistrate Availability Form from Defendant Diane L. St. Pierre. (mh)
March 20, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE OF AVAILABILITY OF JUDICIAL SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. For the benefit of the public and the bar, the District of Utah offers judicial settlement conference as an alternative for dispute resolution assistance in all civil cases and bankruptcy adversary proceedings. The court offers this alternative because, when compared with litigation, it can resolve a dispute faster, at less expense, and with solutions that are better able to meet the parties' needs and interests. Parties may file a stipulated motion for judicial settlement conference. A form #motion is available on the court's website. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Julian Salas, Defendant Diane L. St. Pierre. (kec)
March 20, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY TO PRESIDE OVER CASE- Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, and DUCivR 72-4, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return the form. To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail at the address on the form. Please do not efile the Consent Form in the case. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Julian Salas, Defendant Diane L. St. Pierre. (Notice generated by Clerk's office) Form due by 4/10/2024. (kec)
March 20, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INELIGIBLE ATTORNEY -Attorney Richard Grey, for Plaintiff Julian Salas, has been notified that he/she is not in active status and can not practice before this court. (kec)
March 20, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Third District Court Salt Lake County, case number 240901709, (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AUTDC-5006259) filed by Diane L. St. Pierre. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Docket, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Knight, Jeremy)
March 20, 2024 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge David Barlow. Defendant Diane L. St. Pierre is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and civil cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 405 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (kec)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salas v. St. Pierre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julian Salas
Represented By: Kenneth I. Denos
Represented By: Richard L Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane L. St. Pierre
Represented By: Jeremy G. Knight
Represented By: Andrew D. Wright
Represented By: Sidney Robert Horrocks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?