Tycon Systems Inc v. Tycon Security Advantage System LLC et al
Plaintiff: Tycon Systems Inc
Defendant: Tycon Security Advantage System LLC and Frank Vuong
Case Number: 2:2024cv00350
Filed: May 16, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Howard C Nielson
Referring Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY TO PRESIDE OVER CASE- Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, and DUCivR 72-4, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return the form. To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail at the address on the form. Please do not efile the Consent Form in the case. Notice emailed or mailed to Defendant Frank Vuong. RESENT TO UPDATED ADDRESS. (Notice generated by Clerk's Office) Form due by 8/1/2024. (mh)
July 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 #13 Mail Returned as Undeliverable/No Such Number. Mail sent to Frank Vuong. Zip code updated to 92105. Consent/Reassignment form resent to updated address. (mh)
July 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY TO PRESIDE OVER CASE- Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, and DUCivR 72-4, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return the form. To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail at the address on the form. Please do not efile the Consent Form in the case. Notice emailed or mailed to Defendant Frank Vuong. (Notice generated by Clerk's Office) Form due by 7/22/2024. (mh)
June 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE for Order Granting Alternative Service, Summons and Complaint served on Tycon Security Advantage System LLC and Frank Vuong on 06/12/2024, filed by Plaintiff Tycon Systems Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - email service, #2 Exhibit B - USPS service)(Nydegger, Chad)
June 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Frank Vuong (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (alt)
June 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RECEIVED Magistrate Availability Form from Plaintiff Tycon Systems Inc. (mh)
June 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave for Alternative Service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 6/3/24. (dle)
May 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Alternative Service of Process by Email and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Tycon Systems Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Status on 78665, 2_24-cv-00350-HCN (FRANK VUONG), #2 Exhibit B Status on 78666, 2_24-cv-00350-HCN (TYCON SECURITY ADVANTAGE SYSTEM LLC c_o FRANK HUU VUONG, registered agent or DAT TAN DINH, member), #3 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(Nydegger, Chad)
May 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 05/20/2024. (sg)
May 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DOCKET TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate Judge to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr on 5/17/24. (dle)
May 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to Tycon Security Advantage System LLC. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (sg)
May 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Frank Vuong. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (sg)
May 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Report on the Filing of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (sg)
May 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY TO PRESIDE OVER CASE- Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, and DUCivR 72-4, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return the form. To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail at the address on the form. Please do not efile the Consent Form in the case. Notice emailed or mailed to Plaintiff Tycon Systems Inc. (Notice generated by Clerk's Office) Form due by 6/6/2024. (sg)
May 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tycon Security Advantage System LLC, Frank Vuong (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AUTDC-5064682) filed by Tycon Systems Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet) (Nydegger, Chad)
May 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr added. Case number will now read 2:24-cv-00350-HCN. Please make changes to document captions accordingly. (sg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tycon Systems Inc v. Tycon Security Advantage System LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tycon Security Advantage System LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Vuong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tycon Systems Inc
Represented By: Chad E. Nydegger
Represented By: Matthew A. Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?