Poe v. Honey
Plaintiff: Nicholas Scott Poe
Defendant: FNU Honey
Unknown: Prisoner Litigation Unit and Correction Section (FYI)
Case Number: 2:2025cv00033
Filed: January 13, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dale A Kimball
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2025 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address by Nicholas Scott Poe (kpf)
March 10, 2025 Filing 6 MOTION to lower IFP fee to show cause filed by Plaintiff Nicholas Scott Poe. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kpf)
February 25, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DOCKET TEXT ORDER: On January 14, 2025, based on Plaintiff's Authorization, Consent and Declaration, and Financial Certificate, the Court requested Plaintiff's inmate-accounting office to within thirty days remit Plaintiff's $7 initial partial filing fee (IPFF). (ECF Nos. 2-4.) Plaintiff was warned that failure to file the IPFF would "result in case dismissal without prejudice and without further notice." (ECF No. 3.) The IPFF has not been received yet, and it is ultimately Plaintiffs responsibility to ensure that it is received by the Court. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Plaintiff has thirty days in which to SHOW CAUSE why this case should not be dismissed for his failure to ensure payment of the IPFF. No attached document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 02/25/2025. (kpf)
January 17, 2025 Filing 4 **SEALED DOCUMENT** FINANCIAL CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Nicholas Scott Poe received from Correctional Institution. Initial Partial Filing Fee $ 7.00. (Attachments: #1 Inmate Statement, #2 Statement)(kpf)
January 14, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepaying the Filing Fee. Based on the inmate's attached Required Authorization, Consent, and Declaration, the inmate account office is authorized and requested to: 1) within 14 days file the Financial Certificate showing the Initial Partial Filing Fee together with the inmate account statement as outlined in the attached instructions, and 2) remit the initial partial filing fee within 30 days as outlined in the attached instructions. Failure to comply will result in case dismissal without prejudice and without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 01/14/2025. No attached document. (kpf)
January 13, 2025 Filing 2 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg for review, case file forwarded to PLU. (Received by the court on: 01/13/2025) filed by Plaintiff Nicholas Scott Poe. (sg)
January 13, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FNU Honey (Originally received by the court on 01/13/2025). (Fee Status: PENDING IFP) filed by Nicholas Scott Poe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope ) Assigned to Judge Dale A. Kimball (sg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/28/2025: #3 Exhibits with all pages) (jwt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poe v. Honey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Correction Section (FYI)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Honey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Scott Poe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?