Poe v. Peck
Plaintiff: Nicholas Scott Poe
Defendant: L. Brad Peck
Unknown: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Case Number: 2:2025cv00090
Filed: February 7, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: David Barlow
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2025 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address by Nicholas Scott Poe (kpf)
March 10, 2025 Filing 6 MOTION to lower the IFP fee filed by Plaintiff Nicholas Scott Poe. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kpf)
February 19, 2025 Filing 5 **SEALED DOCUMENT** FINANCIAL CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Nicholas Scott Poe received from Correctional Institution. Initial Partial Filing Fee $ 7.00. (Attachments: #1 Inmate Statement, #2 FFF Initial Payment Statement)(kpf)
February 12, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepaying the Filing Fee. Based on the inmate's attached Required Authorization, Consent, and Declaration, the inmate account office is authorized and requested to: 1) within 14 days file the Financial Certificate showing the Initial Partial Filing Fee together with the inmate account statement as outlined in the attached instructions, and 2) remit the initial partial filing fee within 30 days as outlined in the attached instructions. It is ultimately Plaintiffs responsibility to ensure these items are received from the inmate account office. Failure to comply will result in case dismissal without prejudice and without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 02/12/2025. (kpf)
February 7, 2025 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff Nicholas Scott Poe. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Order)(kec)
February 7, 2025 Filing 2 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg for review, case file forwarded to PLU. (Received by the court on: 2/7/2025) filed by Plaintiff Nicholas Scott Poe. (kec)
February 7, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against L. Brad Peck (Originally received by the court on 2/7/2025). (Fee Status: In Forma Pauperis) filed by Nicholas Scott Poe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope ) Assigned to Judge David Barlow (kec)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poe v. Peck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Scott Poe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Brad Peck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?