Aguilar v. Birkholz
Petitioner: Edwin Aguilar
Respondent: FNU Birkholz and United States of America
Unknown: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Case Number: 2:2025cv00121
Filed: February 19, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Clark Waddoups
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Federal)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2025 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Edwin Aguilar. (jrj)
March 7, 2025 Filing 6 NOTICE OF TRANSMITTAL that case has been transferred to Central District of California via electronic and given the case number 2:25-cv-02240. (kec)
February 25, 2025 Filing 4 Interdistrict Transfer to Central District of California. Record transferred to receiving court electronically. All future documents should be filed in Central District of California District Court. Case closed. (kpf)
February 24, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: It is therefore ordered that the Clerk of the Court is directed to immediately transfer this proceeding, including the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus #1 and the Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #2 to the United States District Court for the Central District of California; and It is further ordered that upon such transfer the Clerk is directed to close this action. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 02/24/2025. (kpf)
February 19, 2025 Filing 2 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett for review, case file forwarded to PLU. (Received by the court on: 2/18/2025) filed by Petitioner Edwin Aguilar. (kec)
February 19, 2025 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - Federal, under 28 U.S.C. 2241 Fee Status: In Forma Pauperis. (Originally received on 2/18/2025) filed by Edwin Aguilar. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) Assigned to Judge Clark Waddoups (kec)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aguilar v. Birkholz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Edwin Aguilar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: FNU Birkholz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Mark Evan Woolf
Represented By: Angela Jean Clifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?