Wigington v. Salt et al
Defendant: Maud Salt
Petitioner: Thomas V. Wigington, III
Respondent: Jean Salt, Joseph B. Salt, George Brooks and Olive Maxwell
Intervenor Defendant: USA
Case Number: 4:2018cv00086
Filed: November 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: David Nuffer
Referring Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Stay #4 Order to Propose Schedule. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 12/20/18 (alt)
December 19, 2018 Filing 8 Motions No Longer Referred: #6 MOTION to Stay re #4 Order to Propose Schedule. The district judge will address the motion. (akj)
December 19, 2018 Filing 7 File Downloaded from XChangeWEB for 7th District Court, San Juan County, consisting of copies of docket sheet and documents filed in state court (Attachments: #1 State Court Petition for Quiet Title, #2 State Court Motion for Alt Svc, #3 State Court Order for Alt Svc, #4 State Court Req for Hrg, #5 State Court Ntc of Hrg, #6 State Court Motion to Cont Hrg, #7 State Court Order to Cont Hrg, #8 State Court Motion for Dflt, #9 State Court Dflt Jgm/Quiet Title, #10 State Court Decl of S. Tsosie, #11 State Court Motion to Intervene, #12 State Court Motion to Wd as Atty, #13 State Court Order to Wd as Atty, #14 State Court Ntc of Appr by AUSA, #15 State Court Ntc to Appr Pro Se, #16 State Court Ntc of Pro Se Appr, #17 State Court Req to Submit, #18 State Court Order to Intervene, #19 State Court Ntc of Removal) (alt)
December 18, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Stay re #4 Order to Propose Schedule, filed by Intervenor Defendant USA. Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead. Attorney Melina Shiraldi added to party USA(pty:intvd)(Shiraldi, Melina)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DOCKET TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. So ordered by Judge David Nuffer on 11/21/18 (docket text only - no attached document) (alt)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen (14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 11/20/18 (alt)
November 19, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Intervenor USA, Petitioner Thomas V. Wigington, III. (nl)
November 19, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 7th District Court - San Juan County, case number 170700009, No Filing Fee No Filing Fee filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A divider sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Oder Granting US Mot to Intervene, #3 Exhibit B - State Court docket, #4 Exhibit C - divider sheet, #5 Exhibit C - Original Quiet Title Petition, #6 Exhibit D - divider sheet, #7 Exhibit D - Default Judgment in State Court, #8 Civil Cover Sheet na) Assigned to Judge David Nuffer (Mangum, John)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge David Nuffer. Intervenor Defendant USA is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) by the end of the business day. Filing Fee waived (USA)NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wigington v. Salt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jean Salt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Joseph B. Salt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: George Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Olive Maxwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maud Salt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: USA
Represented By: John K. Mangum
Represented By: Melina Shiraldi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Thomas V. Wigington, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?