Johnson v. Mancini
Plaintiff: Neldon Paul Johnson
Defendant: Thomas Mancini
Undetermined: Wayne Klein
Case Number: 4:2018cv00087
Filed: November 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: David Nuffer
Referring Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE FROM THE COURTNotice is hereby given that this case is STAYED in accordance with the Corrected Receivership Order, #docket no. 491, entered in United States v. RaPo wer-3, LLC, case no. 2:15-cv-00828-DN (D. Utah), on November 1, 2018. See #14 Notice of Stay. (elm)
January 10, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT & SCHEDULING CONFERENCE HEARING previously set for Friday, 2/8/2019 at 10:30 a.m. before Judge David Nuffer. (asb)
January 9, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Stay by Wayne Klein (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Corrected Receivership Order) (Lehr, Michael)
January 9, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF HEARING:Case Management & Scheduling Conference set for Friday, 2/8/2019 at 10:30 AM in Room 2B (St George) before Judge David Nuffer. The Attorney Planning Meeting Report must be filed and the Proposed Scheduling Order must be emailed in word processing format to dj.nuffer@utd.uscourts.gov as ordered in docket text order 12 dated 12/27/2018.Court Address: 206 West Tabernacle, St George, Utah (asb)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - By no later than Monday, January 28, 2019, the parties must meet, confer, and submit a proposed scheduling order using #the court's form. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on December 27, 2018. (elm)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying without prejudice #9 Motion for ADR - Mediation. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 12/26/18 (alt)
December 14, 2018 Filing 10 Motions No Longer Referred: #9 MOTION for ADR - Mediation (elm)
December 7, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for ADR - Mediation filed by Plaintiff Neldon Paul Johnson. Motion referred to Dustin B. Pead (alt)
November 29, 2018 Filing 8 Amended ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal #2 ) filed by Thomas Mancini. (Gollan, Stewart)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DOCKET TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. So ordered by Judge David Nuffer on 11/28/18 (docket text only - no attached document) (alt)
November 26, 2018 Filing 6 ERRATA to #5 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by Defendant Thomas Mancini . (Gollan, Stewart)
November 26, 2018 Filing 5 Defendant Thomas Mancini's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal #2 ) filed by Thomas Mancini. (Gollan, Stewart)
November 20, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Neldon Paul Johnson, Defendant Thomas Mancini. (tlh)
November 19, 2018 Filing 3 EXHIBITS filed by Thomas Mancini re #2 Notice of Removal,. (Gollan, Stewart)
November 19, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fourth District Court for Millard County, State of Utah, case number 180700041, (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3149564) filed by Thomas Mancini. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice of Removal) Assigned to Judge David Nuffer (Gollan, Stewart)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge David Nuffer. Defendant Thomas Mancini is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Mancini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Mancini
Represented By: Stewart W. Gollan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neldon Paul Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Wayne Klein
Represented By: Michael S. Lehr
Represented By: Jonathan O. Hafen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?