Piper v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Sally Piper
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Undetermined: SSA Notice
Case Number: 4:2019cv00016
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
0 Judge: Paul Kohler
1 Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:0405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2019 Filing 7 REASSIGNMENT to Newly Appointed Magistrate Judge. Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler. Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead no longer assigned to the case. Case number will now read 4:19cv16-PK. Please make changes to document captions accordingly. (rgj)
March 13, 2019 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to US Attorneys Office Utah. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
March 13, 2019 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Attorney General of the United States. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
March 13, 2019 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Nancy A. Berryhill. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill (Originally received by the court on 2/11/2019). (Fee Status: IFP) (Electronic document provided on disc.) filed by Sally Piper. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet 1) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead (nl)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 2/12/2019. (nl)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead for review, case file forwarded to Magistrate Judge. (Received by the court on: 2/11/2019) filed by Plaintiff Sally Piper. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Piper v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: SSA Notice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sally Piper
Represented By: Natalie L. Bolli-Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?