Herrera v. Herbert et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Herrera
Defendant: Chyleen A. Richey and Gary R. Herbert
Not Yet Classified: Prisoner Litigation Unit and Correction Section (FYI)
Case Number: 4:2019cv00046
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: David Nuffer
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF FILING: Affidavit in Support of Indictment filed by Plaintiff Daniel Herrera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit)(kpf)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of Letter to the Court re: Certificate of Inmate Account. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. (kpf)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to File An Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Daniel Herrera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Amended Complaint)(kpf)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of Request for Certificate of Inmate Account. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. (kpf)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Gary R. Herbert and Chyleen A. Richey (Originally received by the court on 06/03/2019). (Fee Status: IFP) filed by Daniel Herrera. (Attachments: #1 Envelope ) Assigned to Judge David Nuffer (tlh) Modified on 6/17/2019 by correcting docket text (tlh).
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Service of Process (Prisoner). ; granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial fee: TBD. Plaintiff shall have thirty days from the date of this order to file with the Court a certified copy of his inmate trust account statements. Collection of Fees Sent: No Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 06/07/2019. (tlh)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Service of Process (Prisoner). Summons to be served on: Gary R. Herbert and Chyleen A. Richey filed by Plaintiff Daniel Herrera. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order )(tlh) Modified on 6/10/2019 by correcting filing date (tlh).
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse for review, case file forwarded to PLU. (Received by the court on: 06/03/2019) filed by Plaintiff Daniel Herrera. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order )(tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herrera v. Herbert et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Correction Section (FYI)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chyleen A. Richey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary R. Herbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?