Brock v. USA
Petitioner: Henry Seth Brock
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 4:2019cv00047
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Ted Stewart
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 ADDENDUM/Amended Petition under 28 USC 2255 to #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Petitioner Henry Seth Brock. (las)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER-denying #3 Motion to Expedite; filed by Henry Seth Brock. It is ORDERED that Petitioner shall have until August 2, 2019, to file (1) a 2255 motion set forth in the official form that will be mailed to him; (2) an objection to the Courts recharacterization of his Petition as a 2255 motion; or (3) a request to withdraw his Petition. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 6/18/19. (jmr)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Expedite Petition filed by Petitioner Henry Seth Brock. (jmr)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Henry Seth Brock re #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Henry Seth Brock. (kpf)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255). Related case: 4:18cr000018 TS. No filing fee required. AUSA added to the case: Yes. filed by Henry Seth Brock. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Envelope ) Assigned to Judge Ted Stewart (tlh) Modified on 6/13/2019 by correcting file date (tlh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brock v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Trina A. Higgins
Represented By: Cy H. Castle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Henry Seth Brock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?