Mazzetti v. Utah Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: James Mazzetti
Defendant: FNU Nelson, Utah Department of Corrections and Utah State Prison
Not Yet Classified: Prisoner Litigation Unit and Correction Section (FYI)
Case Number: 4:2019cv00066
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: David Nuffer
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against FNU Nelson, Utah Department of Corrections, Utah State Prison (Originally received by the court on 8/22/2019). (Fee Status: IFP) filed by James Mazzetti. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State of Utah Petition for Extraodinary Relief, #2 Civil Cover Sheet 1, #3 Envelope 1) Assigned to Judge David Nuffer (nl)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying #4 Motion for Service of Process (Prisoner). ; granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial fee: TBD. Plaintiff shall have thirty days from the date of this order to file with the Court a certified copy of his inmate trust account statements. Collection of Fees Sent: No Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 9/16/2019. (nl)
September 17, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Service of Process (Prisoner) (Originally received by the court on 8/22/2019). Summons to be served on: all defendants, filed by Plaintiff James Mazzetti. (nl)
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Originally received by the court on 8/22/2019) filed by Plaintiff James Mazzetti. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(nl)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 *** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement for James Mazzetti received from Correctional Institution (tlh)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia Romero for review, case file forwarded to PLU. (Received by the court on: 08/22/2019) filed by Plaintiff James Mazzetti. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order on IFP)(tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mazzetti v. Utah Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Utah Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Utah State Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Mazzetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Correction Section (FYI)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?