Brady et al v. Murakami
Plaintiff: Melody Rowden-Brady and Michael V. Brady
Defendant: Kazuma Murakami
Case Number: 4:2019cv00077
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: David Nuffer
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Filing 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler: Case Management Conference held on 11/6/2019. Counsel present for parties. Allegations/facts discussed. Currently scheduling order reviewed. Court informed counsel of magistrate judge availability for settlement discussions. Court adjourned. Attorney for Plaintiff: Bret Hanna, Attorney for Defendant: Kristen Kiburtz. Court Reporter: Electronic.(Time Start: 9:00, Time End: 9:19, Room SG 2B.)(asb)
October 25, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING:4-Day Jury Trial reset to begin 1/5/2021 at 08:30 AM in Room 2B (St George) before Judge David Nuffer. (moved from 12/22/2020) (asb)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 12/20/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 12/20/2019. Expert Discovery due by 6/12/2020. Motions due by 7/20/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/3/2020 at 08:30 AM in Room 2B (St George) before Judge David Nuffer. 4-Day Jury Trial set for 12/22/2020 at 08:15 AM in Room 2B (St George) before Judge David Nuffer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 10/23/19 (alt)
October 16, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Hanna, Bret)
October 7, 2019 Filing 9 File Downloaded from XChangeWEB for 6th District Court, Kane County-Kanab, consisting of copies of docket sheet and documents filed in state court (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 State Court Amended Complaint, #3 State Court Ntc of Removal) (alt)
September 23, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF HEARING: Case Management & Scheduling Conference set for Wednesday, 11/6/2019 at 09:00 AM in Room 2B (St George) before Judge David Nuffer. The Attorney Planning Meeting Report must be filed and the Proposed Scheduling Order must be emailed in word processing format to dj.nuffer@utd.uscourts.gov at least one week before the Conference.Court Address: 206 West Tabernacle, St George, Utah (asb)
September 20, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Kazuma Murakami.(Snow, Tyler)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 9/16/2019. (asb)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER to Prepare Schedule and Prepare for Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 9/16/19. (dla)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs Michael V. Brady, Melody Rowden-Brady, Defendant Kazuma Murakami. (nl)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE FROM THE COURT This case is assigned to the Southern Region of the Central Division of the District of Utah. More information is on the court's #Southern Region web page. (asb)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 6th District Court Kane County, case number 190600027, (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3372998) filed by Kazuma Murakami. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Amended Complaint) Assigned to Judge David Nuffer (Snow, Tyler)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge David Nuffer. Defendant Kazuma Murakami is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brady et al v. Murakami
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kazuma Murakami
Represented By: Tyler V. Snow
Represented By: Kristen C. Kiburtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melody Rowden-Brady
Represented By: Bret M. Hanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael V. Brady
Represented By: Bret M. Hanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?