Wicker v. Bayview Loan Services et al
Petitioner: James B. Wicker
Respondent: Bayview Loan Services and US Bank
Case Number: 4:2019cv00088
Filed: October 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: David Nuffer
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:0001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 Filing 18 USCA Case Number Case Appealed to Tenth Case Number 19-4169 for #15 Notice of Appeal filed by James B. Wicker. (jmr)
December 10, 2019 Modification of Docket re #17 Transmission of Preliminary Record to USCA. Error: Entry is a duplicate of #16 Docket Entry. Correction: Entry #17 has been marked as erroneous. (alt)
December 9, 2019 Filing 17 ERROR: DUPLICATE OF ENTRY #16 - Transmission of Preliminary Record to USCA re #15 Notice of Appeal (Attachments: #1 Appendix) (alt) Modified on 12/10/2019: added error text (alt)
December 9, 2019 Filing 16 Transmission of Preliminary Record to USCA re #15 Notice of Appeal (Attachments: #1 Appendix) (alt)
December 6, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #9 Order, Terminate Motions, #10 Clerk's Judgment, filed by James B. Wicker. Appeals to the USCA for the 10th Circuit. Fee Status: Not Paid. Filing fee $ 505. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (alt)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying #12 Motion for Reconsideration re #9 Order granting Sua Sponte Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 12/4/19 (alt)
December 4, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #12 MOTION for Reconsideration re #9 Order, Terminate Motions and Memorandum in Support filed by Respondents Bayview Loan Services, US Bank. (Hurst, Alan)
November 20, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Reconsideration re #9 Order granting Sua Sponte Motion to Dismiss Action for Failure to State a Claim and Memorandum in Support, filed by Petitioner James B. Wicker (Attachments: #1 Proposed Jgm, #2 Envelope) (alt)
November 19, 2019 Modification of Docket re #11 Response (NOT to motion). Error: Wrong "Date Filed" was entered. Correction: "Date Filed" has been corrected to '11/13/19'. (alt)
November 13, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE to #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, filed by James B. Wicker (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Envelope) (alt) Modified on 11/19/2019: corrected Date Filed (alt)
November 13, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S JUDGMENT that this action is dismissed with prejudice for failure to state a claim - CASE CLOSED. Signed by ALT, Deputy Clerk. Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler no longer assigned to case (alt)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #3 MOTION for Service of Process and granting Sua Sponte Motion to Dismiss Action for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 11/13/19 (alt)
November 7, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 MOTION to Affirm Confirmation of Arbitration Award filed by Respondents Bayview Loan Services, US Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Bayview Loan Servicing LLC and U.S. Bank N.A.'s Motion for Extension of Time to Oppose Motion for Confirmation of Arbitration Award) Motions referred to Paul Kohler.(Hurst, Alan)
November 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Alan M. Hurst on behalf of Bayview Loan Services, US Bank (Hurst, Alan)
November 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert H. Scott on behalf of Bayview Loan Services, US Bank (Scott, Robert)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Motions referred to Paul Kohler. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 11/5/2019. (asb)
November 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Lis Pendens filed by Petitioner James B. Wicker (alt)
October 29, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Service of Process per 9 USC Sec. 9., requesting Notice of the Application for Confirmation of the Arbitration Award to be served on: Bayview Loan Services, US Bank, filed by Petitioner James B. Wicker (alt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/29/2019: #1 Envelope) (alt).
October 24, 2019 Filing 2 Full Filing fee: $ 400.00 received, receipt number 4681088284. (nl)
October 24, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Confirmation of Arbitration Award filed by Petitioner James B. Wicker. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Application, #2 Praecipe to File Application, #3 Affidavit in Support of Application, #4 Exhibit 1-Award made in CA, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Text of Proposed Order, #10 Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Envelope)(nl) Modified on 10/29/2019: removed exhibit descriptors as they did not necessarily match what was attached, e.g. no copy of the 'agreement' is attached (alt) Modified on 10/29/2019 (alt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wicker v. Bayview Loan Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James B. Wicker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bayview Loan Services
Represented By: Robert H. Scott
Represented By: Alan M. Hurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: US Bank
Represented By: Robert H. Scott
Represented By: Alan M. Hurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?