Hunter v. Saul
Plaintiff: Ward Hunter
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Interested Party: SSA Notice
Case Number: 4:2020cv00088
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Paul Kohler
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:0405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Attorney General of the United States. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Andrew M. Saul. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to US Attorneys Office Utah. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl)
August 14, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul (Originally received by the court on 8/13/2020). (Fee Status: IFP) filed by Ward Hunter. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet 1) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler (jl)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 08/14/2020. (jl)
August 13, 2020 Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler for review, case file forwarded to Magistrate Judge. (Received by the court on: 08/13/2020) filed by Plaintiff Ward Hunter. (dw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunter v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ward Hunter
Represented By: Natalie L. Bolli-Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Notice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?