Harmon v. Nelson
Plaintiff: Larry Harmon
Defendant: Shane Nelson
Not Classified By Court: Prisoner Litigation Unit and Correction Section (FYI)
Case Number: 4:2020cv00121
Filed: October 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: David Nuffer
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2020 Filing 10 DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of Letter to the court regarding date of certified copy of Inmate Account Statement. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kpf)
November 25, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to send Certified Copy of Trust Fund Statement filed by Plaintiff Larry Harmon. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kpf)
November 6, 2020 Filing 8 DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of Incident Report re: Petition. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kpf)
November 6, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address by Larry Harmon (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kpf)
November 3, 2020 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against Shane Nelson (Originally received by the court on 10/29/2020). (Fee Status: IFP) filed by Larry Harmon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet 1, #3 Envelope 1) Assigned to Judge David Nuffer (jl)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying #4 Motion for Service of Process (Prisoner). ; granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial fee: TBD. Plaintiff shall have thirty days from the date of this order to file with the Court a certified copy of his inmate trust account statements. Collection of Fees Sent: No Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 11/03/2020. (jl)
November 3, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Service of Process (Prisoner). Summons to be served on: All defendants filed by Plaintiff Larry Harmon. (jl)
November 3, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff Larry Harmon. (jl)
October 29, 2020 Filing 2 *** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement for Larry Harmon received from Correctional Institution (jl)
October 29, 2020 Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg for review, case file forwarded to PLU. (Received by the court on: 10/29/2020) filed by Plaintiff Larry Harmon. (jl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harmon v. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shane Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Correction Section (FYI)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?