Socolov v. USA et al
Plaintiff: Oleg Socolov
Defendant: William LNU and USA
Not Classified By Court: Prisoner Litigation Unit and Correction Section (FYI)
Case Number: 4:2021cv00015
Filed: January 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: David Nuffer
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Oleg Socolov. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kpf)
February 9, 2021 Filing 5 Initial Prisoner Filing Fee: $ 350.0 received, receipt number 4681093340 (nmt)
February 9, 2021 Partial Filing fee: $ 350.00 received, receipt number 4681093340 (nmt) Modified on 2/9/2021 (nmt). Docket entry entered in error docket text struck. Modified on 2/9/2021 (nmt).
February 1, 2021 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against William LNU, USA (Originally received by the court on 01/29/2021). (Fee Status: IFP) filed by Oleg Socolov. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet 1, #4 Envelope 1) Assigned to Judge David Nuffer (jl)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial fee: $20.37. If initial partial fee is not paid within 30 days, the case will be dismissed. Collection of Fees Sent: No Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 02/01/2021. (jl)
January 29, 2021 Filing 2 *** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement for Oleg Socolov received from Correctional Institution (mh)
January 29, 2021 Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead for review, case file forwarded to PLU. (Received by the court on: 01/29/21) filed by Plaintiff Oleg Socolov. (mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Socolov v. USA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oleg Socolov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Correction Section (FYI)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William LNU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?