Four Corners Health Care v. Roots Home Health Care et al
Plaintiff: Four Corners Health Care
Defendant: Kendrick Goldtooth and Roots Home Health Care
Case Number: 4:2021cv00037
Filed: April 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Paul Kohler
Referring Judge: David Nuffer
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Blaine J. Benard on behalf of Roots Home Health Care (Benard, Blaine)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Defendants Kendrick Goldtooth, Roots Home Health Care. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Jared Foutz in Support of Rule 12(b)(2) Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Kendrick Goldtooth in Support of Rule 12(b)(2) Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction) Attorney Michelle Quist added to party Kendrick Goldtooth(pty:dft), Attorney Michelle Quist added to party Roots Home Health Care (pty:dft)(Quist, Michelle)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Four Corners Health Care as to Kendrick Goldtooth Waiver sent on 5/11/2021, answer due 7/12/2021. (Hardman, J.)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Kendrick Goldtooth. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nmt)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Four Corners Health Care as to Roots Home Health Care served on 4/14/2021, answer due 5/5/2021. (Miles, Jeffrey)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Plaintiff Four Corners Health Care. (Miles, Jeffrey)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen (14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 4/8/21 (alt)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DOCKET TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 4/8/2021. (pjd)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE FROM THE COURT This case is assigned to the Southern Region of the Central Division of the District of Utah. More information is on the court's #Southern Region web page. (pjd)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Four Corners Health Care. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nmt)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-3972199) filed by Four Corners Health Care. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge David Nuffer (Hardman, J.)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge David Nuffer. Plaintiff Four Corners Health Care is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Four Corners Health Care v. Roots Home Health Care et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Four Corners Health Care
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Miles
Represented By: J. Gregory Hardman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kendrick Goldtooth
Represented By: Michelle Quist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roots Home Health Care
Represented By: Blaine J. Benard
Represented By: Michelle Quist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?