Mullins v. Stokes
Plaintiff: Robert Andrew Mullins
Defendant: Bob Stokes
Not Classified By Court: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Case Number: 4:2021cv00055
Filed: May 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: David Nuffer
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Partial Filing fee: $ 7.20 received, receipt number 4681094846 (alt)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Seal Case filed by Plaintiff Robert Andrew Mullins (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (alt)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #5 Motion for Service of Process (Prisoner). Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 5/25/2021. Duplicate order entered as clerk did not file the motion at time of case opening. (nl)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Service of Process (Prisoner). Filed by Plaintiff Robert Andrew Mullins. (Originally received by the court on 5/17/2021)(nmt) Modified on 5/26/2021 to add proposed order and original received date (nl). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/26/2021: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (nl).
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Bob Stokes (Originally received by the court on 05/17/2021). (Fee Status: IFP) filed by Robert Andrew Mullins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet 1, #2 Envelope 1) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead (nmt) (Main Document 4 replaced on 5/26/2021) (nl). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/26/2021: #3 Motion to Order Attoney General, #4 Text of Proposed Order) (nl).
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial fee: $7.17. If initial partial fee is not paid within 30 days, the case will be dismissed. Collection of Fees Sent: Yes Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 05/25/2021. (nmt)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, and Envelope. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope)(nmt)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead for review, case file forwarded to PLU. (Received by the court on: 05/17/2021) filed by Plaintiff Robert Andrew Mullins. (nmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mullins v. Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Andrew Mullins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?