P. v. United Healthcare Insurance Company of Illinois et al
Plaintiff: Peter P.
Defendant: United Healthcare Insurance Company of Illinois, United Behavioral Health/Optum and Stat Anesthesia Specialist LTD Medical Benefit Plan
Case Number: 4:2021cv00093
Filed: August 31, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Paul Kohler
Referring Judge: David Nuffer
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint. Answer deadline updated for Stat Anesthesia Specialist LTD Medical Benefit Plan - answer due 12/1/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 10/26/21 (alt)
October 26, 2021 Filing 12 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint, filed by Defendant Stat Anesthesia Specialist LTD Medical Benefit Plan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) Motions referred to Paul Kohler. Attorney Christopher J. Martinez added to party Stat Anesthesia Specialist LTD Medical Benefit Plan (pty:dft)(Martinez, Christopher)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 10/20/21 (alt)
October 20, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re #7 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #2 Complaint. The document was incorrectly filed with all three dft parties selected as filers; however, the actual document only names two of the dfts as filers. The clerk will mark the third dft, "Stat Anesthesia Specialist LTD Medical Benefit Plan" as incorrectly selected and also remove the atty from representing that dft. Parties are reminded to use care when selecting filing parties so the error is not repeated. (alt)
October 20, 2021 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE OF POSSIBLE ERROR re #7 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #2 Complaint. Description of possible error: Two of the defendant names in caption and body text do not match the names as written in the Complaint caption (but one matches that as identified in the body of the complaint). Clarification should be made as to which is correct: "United Behavioral Health/Optum" or "United Behavioral Health", and "United Healthcare Insurance Company of Illinois" or "United Healthcare Insurance Company"? (alt)
October 20, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Peter P. as to United Healthcare Insurance Company of Illinois Waiver sent on 9/1/2021, answer due 11/1/2021. (King, Brian)
October 20, 2021 Filing 7 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #2 Complaint, filed by Defendants Stat Anesthesia Specialist LTD Medical Benefit Plan, United Behavioral Health/Optum, United Healthcare Insurance Company of Illinois. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) Motions referred to Paul Kohler. Attorney Christopher J. Martinez added to party Stat Anesthesia Specialist LTD Medical Benefit Plan (pty:dft), Attorney Christopher J. Martinez added to party United Behavioral Health/Optum(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher J. Martinez added to party United Healthcare Insurance Company of Illinois(pty:dft)(Martinez, Christopher) Modified on 10/20/2021: removed dft not named in document from appearing as a filing party (alt)
October 20, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Peter P. as to United Behavioral Health/Optum Waiver sent on 9/1/2021, answer due 11/1/2021. (King, Brian)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DOCKET TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 9/2/2021. (pjd)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen (14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 9/1/21 (alt)
September 1, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE FROM THE COURT This case is assigned to the Southern Region of the Central Division of the District of Utah. More information is on the court's #Southern Region web page. (pjd)
August 31, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Stat Anesthesia Specialist LTD Medical Benefit Plan, United Behavioral Health/Optum, United Healthcare Insurance Company of Illinois (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4097749) filed by Peter P.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge David Nuffer (King, Brian)
August 31, 2021 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge David Nuffer. Plaintiff Peter P. is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: P. v. United Healthcare Insurance Company of Illinois et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter P.
Represented By: Brian S. King
Represented By: Brent J. Newton
Represented By: Samuel Martin Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare Insurance Company of Illinois
Represented By: Christopher J. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Behavioral Health/Optum
Represented By: Christopher J. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stat Anesthesia Specialist LTD Medical Benefit Plan
Represented By: Christopher J. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?