Torres v. USA
Petitioner: Gerardo Aguilar Torres
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 4:2021cv00097
Filed: September 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: David Nuffer
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO RESPOND - USA must respond to #1 Petitioner's 28 U.S.C. 2255 Motion to Vacate on or before 11/19/21, granting in part #3 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 10/8/21 (alt)
October 7, 2021 Filing 3 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Respondent USA. (Reddish-Day, Angela)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO RESPOND - USA must respond to Petitioner's #1 28 U.S.C. 2255 Motion to Vacate within 30 days of this order. Any reply must be filed by Petitioner within 30 days after the filing of the government's response. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 9/10/2021. (anf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Torres v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gerardo Aguilar Torres
Represented By: Benjamin C. McMurray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Angela Marie Reddish-Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?