Herrera v. Cochran et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Herrera
Defendant: Carrie L. Cochran and Brian Nielson
Not Classified By Court: Correction Section (FYI) and Prisoner Litigation Unit
Case Number: 4:2022cv00012
Filed: March 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: David Nuffer
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of letter stating did not receive receipt re #10 MOTION. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. Envelope shows mail sent before #11 ORDER docketed. Sent copy of docket to address on file 4/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). (jl)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - Plaintiff's #8 motion for recusal is DENIED. Plaintiff's #10 motion for a time extension in which to file his amended complaint is GRANTED. The amended complaint is now due May 6, 2022. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 4/12/2022. (jl)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time the case filed by Plaintiff Daniel Herrera. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). (jl)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 EXHIBITS filed by Daniel Herrera re #5 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(jl)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Disqualify Judge filed by Plaintiff Daniel Herrera. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope). (jl)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM DECISION and Order to Cure Deficient Complaint - Plaintiff must within thirty days cure the Complaint's deficiencies noted above by filing a document entitled, "Amended Complaint." If Plaintiff fails to timely cure the above deficiencies according to this Order's instructions, this action will be dismissed without further notice. Plaintiff shall not try to serve Amended Complaint on Defendants; instead, the Court will perform its screening function and determine itself whether the amended complaint warrants service. No motion for service of process is needed. Plaintiff's #6 motion for preliminary injunctive relief is DENIED. As of this Order, there is no valid complaint on file in this case. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 03/09/2022. (Attachments: #1 Pro Se Litigant Guide, #2 Blank Civil Rights complaint)(jl)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Daniel Herrera originally received by the court on 03/04/2022. (af)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Carrie L. Cochran, Brian Nielson (Originally received by the court on 03/04/2022). (Fee Status: IFP) filed by Daniel Herrera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet 1, #8 Envelope 1) Assigned to Judge David Nuffer (af)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying #3 Motion for Service of Process (Prisoner) ; granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial fee: TBD. Plaintiff shall have thirty days from the date of this order to file with the Court a certified copy of his inmate trust account statements. Collection of Fees Sent: No Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 03/07/2022. (af)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Service of Process (Prisoner) filed by Plaintiff Daniel Herrera. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Service of Process)(af)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of Complaint, Proposed Order for Service of Process, Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Motion for Official Service of Process, Exhibit 1, Exhibit 2, Exhibit 3, Exhibit 4, Exhibit 5, Exhibit 6, Civil Cover Sheet, Envelope. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Service of Process, #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #3 Motion for Official Service of Process, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Envelope)(af)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett for review, case file forwarded to PLU. (Received by the court on: 03/04/2022) filed by Plaintiff Daniel Herrera. (af)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herrera v. Cochran et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrie L. Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Nielson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Correction Section (FYI)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?