Johnson v. O'Malley
Plaintiff: Travis Johnson
Defendant: Martin J. O'Malley
Interested Party: Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 4:2024cv00055
Filed: June 12, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Paul Kohler
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 0405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWW)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE OF CONSENT Under DUCivR 72-4, returned Consent Forms from all relevant parties are now filed. The Magistrate Judge is presiding by consent. (mh)
June 14, 2024 Filing 7 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Travis Johnson. (mh)
June 13, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda A. Berndt on behalf of Martin J. O'Malley (Berndt, Amanda)
June 13, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE - Service in Social Security Case, re #1 Complaint filed. Consistent with the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions Under 42 U.S.C. 405(g) and DUCivR 7-4, the court has notified the Commissioner of the commencement of this action by transmitting a Notice of Electronic Filing to the Social Security Administration and United States Attorney's Office for the District of Utah. Answer due by 8/12/2024. (sg)
June 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis under 28 U.S.C. 1915. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 06/13/2024. (sg)
June 12, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE OF PRESIDING MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, and DUCivR 72-4, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return the form. To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail to the address on the form. Please do not efile the Consent Form in the case. Notice emailed or mailed to Plaintiff Travis Johnson. Form due by 7/3/2024. (mh)
June 12, 2024 Filing 2 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. and Memorandum in Support Case file will be forwarded to a Magistrate Judge after intake review, filed by Plaintiff Travis Johnson. (Bolli-Jones, Natalie)
June 12, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Martin J. O'Malley with In Forma Pauperis request filed by Travis Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bolli-Jones, Natalie)
June 12, 2024 Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler added. Case number will now read 4:24-cv-00055-PK. Please make changes to document captions accordingly. (sg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Johnson
Represented By: Natalie L. Bolli-Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin J. O'Malley
Represented By: Amanda A. Berndt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?