M. et al v. HP et al
Plaintiff: David M., Sue M. and R. M.
Defendant: HP and HP U.S Health and Walfare Benefits Plan
Case Number: 4:2025cv00013
Filed: February 19, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Paul Kohler
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 7 **SEALED DOCUMENT** re #6 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, Memorandum Decision, filed by Plaintiffs David M., R. M., Sue M.NOTE: Filer is instructed to serve the sealed document on all other parties.. (Nielson, Laura)
March 27, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting #3 Motion to Proceed Under Initials. Within fourteen (14) days, Plaintiffs must file under seal with the Court a document containing David M., Sue M., and R.M.s full names. The filing shall remain under seal unless otherwise ordered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 3/27/2025. (alf)
February 20, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Supplementing Order to Propose Schedule and to Prepare for Case Management Conference re #4 Order to Propose Schedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 02/20/2025. (sg)
February 20, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 02/20/2025. (sg)
February 19, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Plaintiff's MOTION to proceed under intitals filed by Plaintiffs David M., R. M., Sue M.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nielson, Laura)
February 19, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AUTDC-5337588) filed by David M., Sue M., R. M.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Nielson, Laura)
February 19, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler. Plaintiffs David M., R. M., Sue M. is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 405.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (sg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: M. et al v. HP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David M.
Represented By: Laura C. Nielson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sue M.
Represented By: Laura C. Nielson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. M.
Represented By: Laura C. Nielson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HP U.S Health and Walfare Benefits Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?