Harris v. Purgatory Correctional Facility et al
Plaintiff: Steven Matthew Harris
Defendant: Purgatory Correctional Facility, Washington County Sheriff's Office, Kyle Bigelow, Garrett McKean, FNU Crowther, FNU Larsen, FNU Lubitz, J. Anderson, FNU Jacobs and Purgatory Correctional Facility Warden
Case Number: 4:2025cv00018
Filed: February 24, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Ann Marie McIff Allen
Referring Judge: Paul Kohler
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS: 1. Plaintiff is ordered to complete and return to the clerks office a summons and Service of Process form for each Defendant. These forms are available on the Courts website: https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/usdc-forms. The completed forms must be hand-delivered, mailed, or emailed to the clerks office by May 9, 2025. The email address is utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov. If the completed forms are not submitted as directed, the Complaint may be dismissed. 2. Upon receipt of the summons and Service of Process forms, the clerk is directed to issue the summons(es) and provide the service packet to the United States Marshals Office. 3. The restriction on filing motions or other documents stated in the Courts February 25, 2025 Order (Docket No. 3) is VACATED. 4. Granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 04/09/2025. (kpf)
March 20, 2025 Filing 5 NOTICE OF NON-CONSENT Consent to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge under DUCivR 72-3 has not been obtained. Case randomly assigned to District Judge Ann Marie McIff Allen and Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler. Magistrate Judge is automatically referred under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B). Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler no longer assigned as the presiding judge to the case. Motions referred to Paul Kohler.(mh)
February 26, 2025 Filing 4 NOTICE OF PRESIDING MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, and DUCivR 72-3, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return the form. To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail to the address on the form. Please do not efile the Consent Form in the case. Notice emailed or mailed to Plaintiff Steven Matthew Harris. Form due by 3/19/2025. (mh)
February 25, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 3 VACATED ORDER temporarily granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The court will screen this action and the time to serve the complaint is tolled. The court will order service of process on the Defendants.Plaintiff must not file any motions or other documents during the time the case is screened. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 2/25/2025. (kec) Modified to vacated order as per order no. 6 on 4/9/2025 (kpf).
February 24, 2025 Filing 2 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler for review, case file forwarded to Magistrate Judge. (Received by the court on: 02/24/2025) filed by Plaintiff Steven Matthew Harris. (sg)
February 24, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against J. Anderson, Kyle Bigelow, FNU Crowther, FNU Jacobs, FNU Larsen, FNU Lubitz, Garrett McKean, Purgatory Correctional Facility, Purgatory Correctional Facility Warden, Washington County Sheriff's Office (Originally received by the court on 02/24/2025). (Fee Status: PENDING IFP) filed by Steven Matthew Harris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope ) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler (sg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Purgatory Correctional Facility et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Matthew Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purgatory Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Bigelow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garrett McKean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Crowther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Lubitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purgatory Correctional Facility Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?