Kozaczek v. ConServe et al
Plaintiff: Leslie Kevin Kozaczek
Defendant: ConServe, New Hampshire Higher Education Assistance Foundation, Granite State Management Services and Sallie Mae, Inc.
Counter_claimant: Granite State Management Services and New Hampshire Higher Education Assistance Foundation
Counter_defendant: Leslie Kevin Kozaczek
Case Number: 1:2012cv00055
Filed: March 14, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Office: Brattleboro Office
County: Windham
Presiding Judge: J. Garvan Murtha
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER denying 92 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Signed by District Judge J. Garvan Murtha on 10/22/2014. (esb)
July 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 64 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 65 Defendants' Cross Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge J. Garvan Murtha on 7/21/2014. (esb)
September 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER: This case is STAYED until November 18, 2013. Within this 60-day time period, Attorney Obuchowski may inform the Court as to his chosen course of action. If nothing is filed within 60 days, the parties shall notify the Court with respect to the status of the bankruptcy proceeding no later than December 2, 2013. Signed by District Judge J. Garvan Murtha on 09/18/2013. (wjf)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kozaczek v. ConServe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Granite State Management Services
Represented By: Albert A. Cicchetti
Represented By: Potter Stewart, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: New Hampshire Higher Education Assistance Foundation
Represented By: Albert A. Cicchetti
Represented By: Potter Stewart, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Leslie Kevin Kozaczek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Kevin Kozaczek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ConServe
Represented By: Matthew B. Byrne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Hampshire Higher Education Assistance Foundation
Represented By: Potter Stewart, Jr.
Represented By: Albert A. Cicchetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Granite State Management Services
Represented By: Potter Stewart, Jr.
Represented By: Albert A. Cicchetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sallie Mae, Inc.
Represented By: Michael P. Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?