Vermonters for a Clean Environment, Inc. et al v. Madrid et al
Plaintiff: Vermonters for a Clean Environment, Inc., Justin Lindholm, Annette Smith, John David Geery, Thomas E. Shea, George S. Halford, Kathy Halford and Tyler Resch
Defendant: Colleen Madrid, Bob Bayer and Charles L. Myers
Case Number: 1:2012cv00073
Filed: April 13, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Office: Brattleboro Office
County: Rutland
Presiding Judge: J. Garvan Murtha
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:4321
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 95 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Plaintiffs' 78 Amended Motion for Summary Judgment, construed as a motion for judgment, is DENIED. Defendants 80 Cross Motion for Judgment is GRANTED. Defendant-Intervenors 82 Cross Motion for Judgment is DENIED as moot. Plaintiffs' 71 Amended Complaint is dismissed. Signed by District Judge J. Garvan Murtha on 12/24/2014. (kak)
September 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER denying 35 Motion for Consideration of Limited Extra-record Materials. Briefing on the motion for judgment on the administrative record shall be filed in accordance with 26 Stipulation and Order approving Joint Briefing Schedule. Signed by District Judge J. Garvan Murtha on 9/11/2012. (kak)
August 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: granting 25 Motion to Intervene by Deerfield Wind, LLC's, subject to the enumerated conditions set forth in this order. Signed by District Judge J. Garvan Murtha on 08/07/2012. (wjf)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vermonters for a Clean Environment, Inc. et al v. Madrid et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vermonters for a Clean Environment, Inc.
Represented By: Robert E. Woolmington
Represented By: Stephen L. Saltonstall, Esq.
Represented By: Patrick J. Bernal, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Lindholm
Represented By: Robert E. Woolmington
Represented By: Stephen L. Saltonstall, Esq.
Represented By: Patrick J. Bernal, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette Smith
Represented By: Patrick J. Bernal, Esq.
Represented By: Stephen L. Saltonstall, Esq.
Represented By: Robert E. Woolmington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John David Geery
Represented By: Patrick J. Bernal, Esq.
Represented By: Stephen L. Saltonstall, Esq.
Represented By: Robert E. Woolmington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas E. Shea
Represented By: Patrick J. Bernal, Esq.
Represented By: Stephen L. Saltonstall, Esq.
Represented By: Robert E. Woolmington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George S. Halford
Represented By: Patrick J. Bernal, Esq.
Represented By: Stephen L. Saltonstall, Esq.
Represented By: Robert E. Woolmington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Halford
Represented By: Patrick J. Bernal, Esq.
Represented By: Stephen L. Saltonstall, Esq.
Represented By: Robert E. Woolmington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Resch
Represented By: Patrick J. Bernal, Esq.
Represented By: Stephen L. Saltonstall, Esq.
Represented By: Robert E. Woolmington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colleen Madrid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Bayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles L. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?