Richardson v. State of Vermont et al

Plaintiff: Devin Richardson
Defendant: State of Vermont, Andrew Pallito, G. Hale and Brouillette
Case Number: 1:2015cv00120
Filed: June 8, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Office: Brattleboro Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: John M. Conroy
Presiding Judge: J. Garvan Murtha
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER Affirming, Approving and Adopting Magistrate Judge's 49 Report and Recommendation GRANTING 42 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge J. Garvan Murtha on 12/7/2016. (kak)
April 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Adopting 34 Report and Recommendation denying 31 MOTION for Summary Judgment. The matter is returned to the magistrate judge for further proceedings. It is certified that any appeal of this matter would not be taken in good faith, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3). Signed by District Judge J. Garvan Murtha on 4/12/2016. (esb)
January 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Adopting 28 Report and Recommendation. Defendants' 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim is granted in part and denied in part. The matter is remanded for further proceedings. Signed by District Judge J. Garvan Murtha on 1/28/2016. (esb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richardson v. State of Vermont et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devin Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Vermont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Pallito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brouillette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?