Coniff et al v. State of Vermont et al
Plaintiff: Neil W. Aguiar, Kathy M. Blanchard, Thomas R. Burke, Dominic G. Damato, Carmen Howe, Paula Catherine, Bille J. Raymond, James A. Farrell, Marilyn R. Richards, Daniel Towle, Elliott M. Benay, Marie L. Caduto, Monique Sordiff, Julie A. Trottier, Karen B. McEwing, John Austin, Allen C. Palmer, Elizabeth M. Manfredi, John J. Demeter, J. Douglas Dows, Ruth T. Matthews, Ed Wageman, Kenneth A. Robie, Chad A. Allen, John Jaworski, Bennett S. Truman, Gregory D. Kelly, Rodney I. Pingree, George Robson, Kelly H. LaMonda, Gregory M. Maguire, Carol R. Rose, Alvin A. Simard, Jason G. Boyd, Laura E. Ewell, Gholam-Ray Marzbani, Rae Hirst, Adele Edelman, Vaughn D. Works, Aula E. DeWitt, Danny R. Landry, Aime E. Cloutier, Lindsay Simpson, Robert McNeil, Lara Boutaugh-Commoss, Wendy Blake, Anne Bordonaro, Nancy Marinelli, Caroline M. Haag-Marsh, Rosemary C. Walsh, Andre V. Thibault, Linda A. Merchant, Gregory L. Miller, Rebecca V. Spaulding, Margaret Hodder, Mary Lou Hood, Glen M. Torres, Edward A. Jackson, Richard Smith, Frank J. Perricone, Douglas A. Powell, Jessanne Wyman, Kara Pallman, Luke B. Purvis, Leonard Cave, Tracy Tapley, Janice G. Leonard, Kevin J. Stapleton, Jason Pinard, Terri L. Tibbetts, Daly J. Walter, Megan J. Moir, Victoria Conti, Brigitte Codling, Karen Lawsing, Marie-Michele Joyal, Coleen Bean, Mark A. Bissonnette, Paul Winters, Deborah A. Caruso, Alydia Payette, Arthur J. Bombardier, Rob Lowe, Bruce A. Martell, Michael J. Fowler, Janette L. Floyd, Carol L. Lipani, Kim A. Wittorff, Terrance P. Greenwood, Deborah A. Caldbeck, Alexis M. McLean, Karen A. Crampton, Elizabeth R. Demers, Ernest A. Laird, Richard A. Barany, Les Wilder, Jane E. Menard, Jonathan F. Grzych, Gerold Noyes, Laura L. Cornell, Joan Haslett, Bryan E. Wemple, Cathy S. Wilson, Sharon Crout, Curtis P. Smiley, Dwight Robtoy, Daniel W. Champney, Sandra E. Hunt, Sarah Helen Jordan, Erin M. Mcsweeney, Bruce B. Epstein, Connie L. Mckeighan, Christine E. LaBarre, Robert C. King, Paul E. Frederick, Jeanne M. Neal, Erica Aubut, Sara Jean Boardman, Douglas W. Newton, Lisa J. Johnson, Kelly Spear, Eugene R. Allen, Kenneth W. McNamara, Peter Hodgson, Jennifer May Lilley, Charles C. Tatro, Laurie E. Greenwood, Ellen Pulsifer, John Frederick Dunham, Jr., Hilary J. Denton, Kimberly J. Prior, Tracy LaFrance, Patricia K. Johnson, Katherine J. Plummer, Patricia Brett, Stephanie Fuller, Kelly G. Connelley, Michael R. LaClair, Eunice H. Froeliger, Ebony V. Nyoni (Kirkland), Daniel A. Thompson, Alyssa Todd, Michelle L. LaPerle, Roger Lathrop, Lisa DeBlois, Richmond H. Hopkins, III, Peggy S. Heath, Kathleen S. Rifenburg, Eugene J. Bifano, Janis L. Appel, Trini L. Barssard, Sylvia Buzzell, Brian C. Roberts, Michael Wilder, Donald Isabelle, James J. Ryan, Mark W. Smith, Ivy Harris, Walter Steven Litkovitz, Mark H. Jones, John M. Johnston, Amy Roth, And L. Morse, Robert J. Drawbaugh, Deborah W. Ferrell, Steven P. Smith, Kim K. Revoir, Michael J. Wood, Elizabeth L. Ross-Mobbs, Jennifer B. Egelhof, Nancy A. Trombley, Christine Marie Hetzel, David F. Hale, Carolyn M. Krug, Judy A. Mirro, Martha Price, Michael Feulner, Philip L. Jones, David Hosking, Cheryl Reed, Mary P. Bolton, James Wild, Shelly AC Thayer, James Lowell Landis, Arthur Hamlin, Katie A. Derosier, Brad R. Epstein, Janice Sotirakis, Stanley Morse, Helen Keith, Robert B. Johnston, Michael W. Young, Michael W. Peterson, Amy Shaefer, Janet K. Dunigan, Mary E. Koen, Julie L. Tucker, Susan L. Pinto, Frank J. Malnati, Jr., Mary Lyn Pfister, Susan E. Ransom-Kelley, Peter Comart, Richard P. Greenwood, Elizabeth Maurer, Anne M. Porter, Jennifer Lyford, Katrina Mouquin, Wilhelmina L. Picard, Kimberly S. Bean, Elise Raymond, Janine Parker, John Olson, Lisa L. Racine, Robert Suckert, Stephanie Briggs, Margaret E. Wilson, David M. Trombley, Katherine M. McNamara, Arthur E. Danyow, III, Cindy A. Laraway, John Brabant, Francis J. Mullins, III, Richard J. Byrne, Douglas E. Petterson, Maureen H. Montgomery, Kevin F. Burke, John L. Hoy, Raymond C. Kellett, Jerry Forkin, Kevin W. Oddy, Leah I. Korce, Karen M. Flynn, Paul Beyor, David Patterson, Thomas Joslin, Melvin Darling, Jr., Judith Blank, Nancy L. Bradshaw, Matthew D. Bruhns, Timothy R. Raymond, Gayle C. Lee, Valerie Reynolds-Petitt, Christopher W. Olson, Jules Junker, George S. Mitchell, Kevin R. McClure, Timothy Pockette, Laureen M. Shannon, Valerie D. Cyr, Carl W. Gleason, Kevin A. Pecor, Matt Messier, Aaron M. Hurst, Susan M. Aikman, David B. Clark, Cheryl A. Ridley-Roy, Denis R. Barton, Ean Briere, Tamara Evanson, Ghislaine M. Girouard, Stephen J. Reckers, Nancy B. Lord, Patricia C. Strader, Paul O. Stratton, III, Siobhan Perricone, Amy Richardson, Patricia M. Houston, Philip M. Fagan, Breck P. Campbell, Amy B. Darley, Neill W. Aguiar, Stephen K. Woodward, Jacqueline Bilodeau, Al Dubuque, Roger L. Gillim, Carol L. Duley, William L. Center, James P. Mall, Sheri Lynn, Allison R. Keelty, Michael M. Mitchell, Gena M. Hicks, Sean A. Foley, Peter M. Oparowski, Thomas A. Krug, Ginger Radke, Kenneth Upmal, Mark Bosman, Ernest F. Kelley, Melissa F. Hoellerich, Danny A. Flood, William A. Jewell, Peter Drescher, Leslie A. Drown, Robert Lutz, Jr., Timothy P. Morton, Melanie L. D'Amico, John P. Dumville, Roger Bergeron, Thomas E. Chase, Gaston F. Roy, Roland Grenier, Jr., Kate M. Dempsey, Tammie Lowell, John Quinn, III, Brian E. Thompson, Neil W. Monteith, Enita M. Bourdreau, Stephen G. Parise, Gregory G. McLelland, Karen L. Brown, Loren T. Shaw, Edmond E. Swanberg, Lawrence D. Houston, Dawn F. Chittenden, Jamie A. Sheltra, Ellen E. Parr Doering, Carol MacDougall, Nancy J. Miller, John J. Akielaszek, Andrea Wright, Megan Tierney-Ward, Joseph M. Harris, Stephanie A. Beck, Russell L. Carrier, Jr., Kathryn Gehr, Brenda Dawson Crocket, John Andrew Bibens, Jane M. Berry, Suzanne Hopkins, Josh L. Schultz, Anthony E. Morgan, Jan W. Ciemiecki, Jeremy M. McMullen, Joseph L. Richardson, Paul T. Kane, Kenneth Denton, Edwin M. DeMott, III, Michael Carey, Roger A. Tremblay, Jr., Jack Green, Scott Wheatley, Kenneth P. Leach, Ian Jenike, George R. Decell, Rebekah M. Stephens, Connie Clay-Bickel, Nancy P. Webster, Jon J. Kart, Susan Viens, Rhonda Mabey, Donna Hosking, Kiersten J. Andersen, Brian D. Chipman, George W. Voss, Jessie F. Brosseau, Kathy Lantagne, Melissa Jenkins, Joan C. Bowker, Christine Anne Shepard, Ann P. Horsman, Carol A. McGranaghan, Kevin F. Willey, Jeanette M. Fisher, Mari McIntosh, Marybeth McCaffrey, Diane L. Bogdan, Scott D. Shafer, Roderick S. Wenworth, Steven W. Hanna, Karen S. Canas, Michael H. Daniels, Donna L. Bister, Kevin S. Clairmont, Sharon L. Cave, Rebecca J. Chalmers, Ernest Patnoe, Jeremy M. Goetz, Leif L. Richardson, Sandra W. Lambert, Tawny Allen, Steven R. Godin, Patricia S. Kennelly, Travis M. Denton, Terry L. Fitzgerald, Daniel O. Bruyette, Judy D. Gilmore, Michael B. Smith, Joseph H. Whittemore, Jonathan Z. Parsons, Beverly A. Croteau, Sarah Systo, Leslie Wilcox, Celina K. Little, James Harris, Edward Thomas, Emily Reed, David Fitts, Roger Daigle, Mary Joanne Watson, Beverly Heise, Marlys M. Beck, Kate Barany, Thomas H. Lackey, Carol M. Lavery, Diane E. Colgan, Christy E. Witters, Ellen T. Bissonnette, Norman Marie Floyd, Gerald P. Irvine, II, Craig R. DiGiammarino, Laurie M. Colgan, Karen Ackermann, Marcia A. Guyette, Susan L. Eldridge, Linda Ann Boccuzzo, Richard C. Wormwood, Stewart D. Menard, James J. Laskarzewski, Trini L. Brassard, Timothy F. Schmalz, Yvonne Labare, Lynne A. Silloway, Ethan Swift, Noel C. Bryant, Douglas E. Matten, Randy J. Quenneville, Jeff M. Briggs, Sarah Nash, John Reese, Jr., Lisa Rivers, Larry Rosenberger, Jr., Steven Barden, Carey Hengstenberg, Rebecca Roy Phelps, Ryan S. Connolly, Michael W. Perry, William R. Carrigan, Sally Tappan, June E. Bascom, Daniel A. Heyde, Gunther Hetzel, Duncan C. Wilkie, Susan O. Leclair, Christina Wilder, Ronald R. Lafond, Jr., Ann F. Hastings, Joseph C. Leclair, James P. Candon, II, Kathy Hemenway, Marie L. Maclay, Suzannah J. Roche, Margo Rome, William G. Mills, Erin L. Lawrence, Brian Frost, Patricia H. Duda, Jeanette J. VonFeldt, Michael LaPera, Raymond S. Zelesky, Teresa A. Lamos, William E. Zabiloski, David W. Martinson, Thomas Cummings, Alan R. Patunoff, Michael J. Miller, Thomas M. Jenny, Walter J. Daly, Christopher Seguin, Ronnie B. Cohen, Debbie K. McAdoo, Steven McLaughlin, Maria Godleski, Karla D. Perkins, Christine A. St. John, Steven M. Bushey, Shannon Morton, Judy P. Rosenstreich, Elizabeth A. Henderson, Julia H. Schmitz, David Kreindler, Frederick A. Erskine, Jr., James P. Cameron, Kristina M. Hetzel, Joseph P. Geoffroy, Julie Foley, Todd E. Hill, Lynn LaBonte, Patricia M. LaBelle, Michael J. O'Shana, Patricia C. Hartman, Mark W. Kavanagh, Sheila Coniff, Janet M. O'Bryan, Michael Orticari, Angela T. Wilder, Ruthellen Doyon, Leslie Stapleton, R. Allyn Lewis, Janet Louise Miller, Molly E. Jarvis, William J. Ploof, Timothy B. Fleming, Rachael B. Lizotte, Michael Steven Frank, Susan M. Williams, Teri L. Berube, Martha J. Evans-Mongeon, Charles Miller, Rhonda J. Larrabee, Cara L. McSherry, James Rouleau, Deborah J. Kellogg, Donna McAllister, Robert Hooper, Malinda J. Johnson, Michael LaCroix, Brian T. Fitzgerald, Leonard J. Champy, Mary K. Brown, David DiDomenico, Giovanna Peebles, Robert J. Gioria, Thomas J. Vasta, Jon P. Turmel, Carol E. Blake, Paul J. Bicica, Michael Metz, Daniel K. Boyce, Alan B. Johnson, David P. O'Vitt, Kimberly A. LaFrance, Thomas M. Brown, Joseph H. Berchick, Lynda C. Schoenbeck, Robert Blair, Susan Morrison, Donald L. Grabowski, Paul J. O'Kane, Sandra L. Hoffman, Thomas M. Nelson, Diana L. Frederick, Jennifer A. Harrington, John R. Bliss, John Mangione, Heather A. Gibbs, Dianne E. Jabar, Kay D. Ingraham, Jeffrey K. Howard, Diane Danforth, David L. Wilcox, Thomas H. Rotella, Laurie J. Smith, Nathan Fice, Trilene M. Roach, Eileen R. Worcester, Carl H. Fielder, Jacqueline Corbally, Richard Hosking, June F. Kelly, Jeffrey R. Cueto, Bennet J. Deliduka, Teresa R. Bogaczyk, Greg Wilcox, Glenn E. Massey, Karen Graham, William Schwartz, Elysian Graham, Kathleen A. Francis, Richard H. Moffi, Craig A. Benson, Jon J. Kilian, David Paganelli, Catherine Cunningham, Howard N. Cohen, Patricia L. Bostock, Albert L. Lamson, Delvin Warner, Joanne A. Herring, Barbara L. Johnston, Thomas O. Mancini, Brad C. James, Ken Horssman and Laura J. Treichler
Defendant: Jeb Spaulding, Neale Lunderville and State of Vermont
Not Classified By Court: ENE Evaluator
Case Number: 2:2010cv00032
Filed: February 8, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Office: Burlington Office
County: Chittenden
Presiding Judge: William K Sessions
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:0201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2015 Filing 146 MANDATE of USCA Circuit No. 13-4198 as to #141 Notice of Appeal. It is Ordered that the #140 judgment of the district court dismissing the action by reason of the general sovereign immunity of the state defendants is AFFIRMED. (gmg)
December 10, 2013 Filing 145 TRANSMITTED Supplemental Record on Appeal Circuit No. 13-4198 transmitted to US Court of Appeals re #141 Notice of Appeal. (gmg)
December 5, 2013 Filing 144 TRANSCRIPT filed for dates of 03/19/2013 Motions Hearing before Judge Sessions re #141 Notice of Appeal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Anne Nichols Pierce, Telephone number 802-860-2227. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 12/30/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/9/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/10/2014. (jam)
November 14, 2013 Filing 143 USCA Transcript Information Form D filed by plaintiffs re #141 Notice of Appeal. (gmg)
November 14, 2013 Filing 142 TRANSMITTED Index on Appeal Circuit No. 13-4198 re: #141 Notice of Appeal. (gmg)
October 29, 2013 USCA Appeal Fees received $455 receipt number 4682009706 re #141 Notice of Appeal filed by all plaintiffs. (gmg)
October 29, 2013 Filing 141 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #139 Opinion and Order, #140 Judgment by all plaintiffs. (Bergeron, Adam) Text clarified on 10/29/2013 (law).
September 30, 2013 Filing 140 JUDGMENT entered for defendants State of Vermont, State of Vermont AgencyAdministration, Jeb Spaulding, against all plaintiffs. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 9/30/2013. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Litigants (appeal period expires 10/30/2013))(law)
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 139 OPINION AND ORDER granting #122 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying #123 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; dismissing as moot #122 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, #127 Motion for Summary Judgment, #129 Motion for Summary Judgment. However, the Court has addressed the merits of the salary basis test and finds that the State would also be entitled to Summary Judgment on this issue. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 9/30/2013. (law)
March 19, 2013 Motions Taken Under Advisement: #123 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Sovereign Immunity, #127 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Salary Test, #122 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings, #129 MOTION for Summary Judgment (jam)
March 19, 2013 Filing 138 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge William K. Sessions III: Motion Hearing held on 3/19/2013. Thomas Somers, Esq. & Adam Bergeron, Esq. present for pltfs; Jonathan Rose, Esq. & Todd Daloz, Esq. present for dfts. Statements by counsel. Motions Taken Under Advisement: #122 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings, #123 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Sovereign Immunity, #127 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Salary Test, #129 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Court Reporter: Pierce) (jam)
March 1, 2013 Filing 137 NOTICE of Hearing re: #122 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings, #127 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Salary Test, #129 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #123 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Sovereign Immunity. Motion Hearing set for 3/19/2013 01:30 PM in Burlington Courtroom 542 before Judge William K. Sessions III.(jam)
February 5, 2013 Filing 136 REPLY to Response to #127 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Salary Test filed by Sheila Coniff. (Bergeron, Adam)
February 5, 2013 Filing 135 REPLY to Response to #129 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Jeb Spaulding, State of Vermont, State of Vermont Agency Administration. (Rose, Jonathan)
January 22, 2013 Filing 134 RESPONSE in Opposition to #127 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Salary Test filed by Jeb Spaulding, State of Vermont, State of Vermont Agency Administration. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Rose, Jonathan)
January 22, 2013 Filing 133 RESPONSE in Opposition to #129 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Salary Testand RESPONSE in Support of #127 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Sheila Coniff. (Attachments: #1 Response to Statement of Facts)(Bergeron, Adam) Link added on 1/31/2013 (jlh).
January 22, 2013 Filing 132 RESPONSE to Plaintiffs' Statement of Undisputed Facts in re: #127 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Salary Test by Jeb Spaulding, State of Vermont, State of Vermont Agency Administration. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Rose, Jonathan) Link added on 1/23/2013 (jlh).
January 4, 2013 Filing 131 REPLY to Response to #122 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Jeb Spaulding, State of Vermont, State of Vermont Agency Administration. (Rose, Jonathan)
January 4, 2013 Filing 130 REPLY to Response to #123 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Sovereign Immunity filed by Sheila Coniff. (Bergeron, Adam)
December 21, 2012 Filing 129 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Jeb Spaulding, State of Vermont, State of Vermont Agency Administration. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11)(Rose, Jonathan) Attachments description clarified on 12/26/2012 (law).
December 21, 2012 Filing 128 RESPONSE in Opposition to #123 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Sovereign Immunity filed by Jeb Spaulding, State of Vermont, State of Vermont Agency Administration. (Rose, Jonathan)
December 21, 2012 Filing 127 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Salary Test filed by Sheila Coniff. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, #2 Index for Exhibits, #3 Declaration of Sheila Coniff - Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Declaration of Katherine Whalen - Exhibit L)(Bergeron, Adam)
December 21, 2012 Filing 126 RESPONSE in Opposition to #122 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Sheila Coniff. (Bergeron, Adam)
December 18, 2012 Filing 125 STIPULATION of Facts re: #127 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Salary Test, #129 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Jeb Spaulding, State of Vermont, State of Vermont Agency Administration. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Rose, Jonathan) Links added, text clarified on 12/21/2012 (law).
December 17, 2012 Filing 124 AMENDED ANSWER to #13 Second Amended Collective Action Complaint by Jeb Spaulding, State of Vermont, State of Vermont Agency Administration. (Rose, Jonathan)
November 26, 2012 Filing 123 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Sovereign Immunity filed by Sheila Coniff. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Certificate of Service)(Bergeron, Adam) Attachment 2 description clarified on 11/27/2012 (law).
November 26, 2012 Filing 122 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Jeb Spaulding, State of Vermont, State of Vermont Agency Administration. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Rose, Jonathan)
October 24, 2012 Filing 121 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge William K. Sessions III: Motion Hearing held on 10/24/2012 re #116 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses filed by Sheila Coniff. Thomas Somers, Esq. & Adam Bergeron, Esq. present for pltfs; Jonathan Rose, Esq. & Todd Daloz, Esq. present for dfts. Court makes inquiries. Statements by counsel. ORDERED: denying #116 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses; both sides may depose participants present in the conversation on limited issues; ptys may file motions re: sovereign immunity by 11/26/2012; discovery completed by 11/26/2012; dispositive motions due by 12/21/2012. (Court Reporter: Nichols Pierce) (jam)
October 1, 2012 Filing 120 NOTICE of Hearing re: #116 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses. Motion Hearing set for 10/24/2012 10:00 AM in Burlington Courtroom 542 before Judge William K. Sessions III.(jam)
September 18, 2012 Filing 119 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Todd Daloz on behalf of Jeb Spaulding, State of Vermont, State of Vermont Agency Administration. (Daloz, Todd)
September 13, 2012 Filing 118 REPLY to Response to #116 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses filed by Sheila Coniff. (Bergeron, Adam)
August 30, 2012 Filing 117 RESPONSE in Opposition re #116 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses filed by Jeb Spaulding, State of Vermont, State of Vermont Agency Administration. (Rose, Jonathan)
August 16, 2012 Filing 116 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses filed by Sheila Coniff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Affidavit of Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.)(Bergeron, Adam) Attachment name clarified on 8/17/2012 (jlh). Docket text clarified on 8/23/2012 (law).
August 15, 2012 Filing 115 TRANSCRIPT of hearing on Motion to Amend Answer to Amended Complaint held on 7/3/2012 before Judge Sessions. Court Reporter/Transcriber Deborah J. Slinn, Capitol Court Reporters, Inc., Telephone number 802-863-6067. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 9/7/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/17/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/16/2012. (jam)
July 27, 2012 Filing 114 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE re: Defendants' Initial Objections and Responsses to Plaintiffs' Fourth Set of Interrogatories and Requests to Produce by Jeb Spaulding, State of Vermont, State of Vermont Agency Administration.(Rose, Jonathan)
July 13, 2012 Filing 113 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - Interrogatories and Request to Produce Fourth by Sheila Coniff.(Bergeron, Adam)
July 3, 2012 Filing 112 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge William K. Sessions III: Motion Hearing held on 7/3/2012 re #104 MOTION to Amend #26 Answer to Amended Complaint. Thomas Somers, Esq. & Adam Bergeron, Esq. present for pltfs; Jonathan Rose, Esq. & Todd Daloz, Esq. present for dfts. Statements by counsel. ORDERED: granting in part; denying in part #104 MOTION to Amend #26 Answer to Amended Complaint; granted as to the good faith defense and denied as to the sovereign immunity defense which may be addressed by way of a dispositive motion; discovery solely on the sovereign immunity defense to be conducted within 90 days; the state has 120 days to file motion to dismiss on sovereign immunity. (Court Reporter: D. Slinn, Capitol Court Reporters, Inc.) (jam)
June 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER granting #109 Motion to Exceed Page Limit. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 06/29/12. (This is a text only Order.) (eae)
June 28, 2012 Filing 110 REPLY to Response to #104 MOTION to Amend #26 Answer to Amended Complaint filed by Jeb Spaulding, State of Vermont, State of Vermont Agency Administration. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rose, Jonathan)
June 28, 2012 Filing 109 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit re: #110 Reply filed by Jeb Spaulding, State of Vermont, State of Vermont Agency Administration.(Rose, Jonathan) Link added on 6/29/2012 (jlh).
June 27, 2012 Filing 108 NOTICE of Hearing re: #104 MOTION to Amend #26 Answer to Amended Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 7/3/2012 09:30 AM in Burlington Courtroom 542 before Judge William K. Sessions III.(law)
June 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER granting #105 Stipulated Motion to Amend The Discovery Schedule/Order. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 06/13/12. (This is a text only Order.) (eae)
June 12, 2012 Filing 106 RESPONSE in Opposition re #104 MOTION to Amend #26 Answer to Amended Complaint filed by Sheila Coniff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Bergeron, Adam) Attachment names clarified on 6/13/2012 (jlh).
June 12, 2012 Filing 105 STIPULATED MOTION to Amend the Discovery Schedule/Order filed by all parties.(Bergeron, Adam) Text clarified and filers added on 6/12/2012 (law).
June 7, 2012 Filing 104 MOTION to Amend #26 Answer to Amended Complaint filed by Neale Lunderville, Jeb Spaulding, State of Vermont, State of Vermont Agency Administration. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Rose, Jonathan)
June 6, 2012 Filing 103 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE re: Supplemental Responses to Plaintiff's Third Set of interrogatories and Request to Produce by Jeb Spaulding, State of Vermont, State of Vermont Agency Administration.(Rose, Jonathan)
May 30, 2012 Filing 102 NOTICE of Attorney Substitution by Jonathan T. Rose for Keith Aten as to State of Vermont.(Rose, Jonathan) Filer modified on 5/30/2012 (law).
May 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting #100 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 05/11/12. (This is a text only Order.) (eae)
May 3, 2012 Filing 100 JOINT MOTION to Amend the Discovery Schedule/Order filed by All Parties. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bergeron, Adam) Text clarified on 5/4/2012 (jlh).
May 3, 2012 Filing 99 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam P. Bergeron on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bergeron, Adam)
March 22, 2012 Filing 98 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - Responses to Third Set of Interrogatories and Request to Produce by Jeb Spaulding, State of Vermont, State of Vermont Agency Administration.(Aten, Keith) Text clarified on 3/22/2012 (jlh).
February 15, 2012 Filing 97 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed on 2/3/2012 upon Christine Howe re: subpoena to appear for a deposition filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Subpoena to Appear for a Deposition)(law)
February 1, 2012 Filing 96 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re: Notice of Deposition of Molly Paulger by plaintiffs. (Somers, Thomas) Text clarified on 2/2/2012 (law).
January 20, 2012 Filing 95 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE re: Notice of Deposition Duces Tecum of Robert Greemore by all plaintiffs . (Somers, Thomas) Text clarified on 1/22/2012 (law).
January 20, 2012 Filing 94 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE: Notice of Deposition of Penny Walker by all plaintiffs. (Somers, Thomas) Text clarified on 1/23/2012 (law).
January 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting #92 Joint Motion to Amend The Discovery Schedule/Order. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 01/19/12. (This is a text only Order.) (eae)
January 19, 2012 Filing 92 JOINT MOTION to Amend the Discovery Schedule/Order filed by all parties. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Somers, Thomas)
December 13, 2011 Filing 91 REPORT of Early Neutral Evaluation: 2nd session - no settlement.(hbc)
November 30, 2011 Filing 90 ENE LETTER to counsel re: past due 2nd ENE session date. Response due by 12/7/2011.(hbc)
November 17, 2011 Filing 89 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - Third Set of Interrogatories and Requests to Produce by all plaintiffs.(Somers, Thomas)
October 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting #87 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 10/26/11. (This is a text only Order.)(eae)
October 25, 2011 Filing 87 CONSENTED-TO MOTION to Withdraw by Attorney Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq filed by on behalf of plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Stackpole, Kerin) Text simplified on 10/25/2011 (law).
October 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 86 STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Laurie J. Smith. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 10/24/2011. (law)
October 21, 2011 Filing 85 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Plaintiff Laurie J. Smith by Laurie J. Smith, State of Vermont, State of Vermont Agency Administration, Jeb Spaulding. (Somers, Thomas) Filers added on 10/24/2011 (law).
October 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting #83 Joint Stipulated Motion for Extension To Amend The Discovery Schedule/Order. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 10/20/11. (This is a text only Order.) (eae)
October 19, 2011 Filing 83 JOINT STIPULATED MOTION to Amend the Discovery Schedule/Order filed by Jeb Spaulding, State of Vermont, State of Vermont Agency Administration. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Aten, Keith)
September 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting #81 Stipulated Motion to Extend Discovery Schedule. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 09/16/11. (This is a text only Order.) (eae)
September 16, 2011 Filing 81 STIPULATED MOTION to Amend the Discovery Schedule/Order filed by Neale Lunderville, Jeb Spaulding, State of Vermont, State of Vermont Agency Administration (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service).(Aten, Keith)
August 31, 2011 Filing 80 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - Responses to Second Interrogatories and Request to Produce by Neale Lunderville, Jeb Spaulding, State of Vermont, State of Vermont Agency Administration.(Aten, Keith) Text clarified on 8/31/2011 (jlh).
August 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting #78 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 08/25/11. (This is a text only Order.) (eae)
August 24, 2011 Filing 78 STIPULATED MOTION to Amend the Discovery Schedule/Order filed by Neale Lunderville, Jeb Spaulding, State of Vermont, State of Vermont Agency Administration (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service).(Aten, Keith) Text clarified on 8/25/2011 (law).
August 19, 2011 Filing 77 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 9/26/2011 at 11:30 AM in Burlington Courtroom 542 before Judge William K. Sessions III (jam)
July 25, 2011 Filing 76 REPORT of Early Neutral Evaluation: No settlement. Parties agreed to second session on 9/21/2011.(hbc)
June 14, 2011 Filing 74 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE re: Expert Disclosure by Jeb Spaulding, State of Vermont, State of Vermont Agency Administration.(Aten, Keith)
June 7, 2011 Filing 75 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - Supplemental Responses to First Set of Interrogatories and Requests to Produce by Jeb Spaulding, State of Vermont, State of Vermont Agency Administration.(law)
May 24, 2011 Filing 73 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE re: Second Set of Interrogatories and Requests to Produce by Plaintiffs.(Somers, Thomas)
May 19, 2011 Filing 72 ENE LETTER re rescheduled session date to 7/20/2011 by Plaintiffs.(hbc)
April 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 71 STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Plaintiff Linda Boccuzzo. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 4/1/11. (law)
March 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting #69 Stipulated Eleventh Motion to Join Additional Party Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 03/31/11. (This is a text only Order.) (eae)
March 30, 2011 RECEIVED Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Linda Ann Boccuzzo, Jeb Spaulding, State of Vermont, State of Vermont Agency Administration. (law)
March 30, 2011 Filing 69 STIPULATED ELEVENTH MOTION to Join Additional Party Plaintiffs by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(law)
March 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting #67 Stipulated Tenth Motion to Join Additional Party Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 03/29/11. (This is a text only Order.) (eae)
March 28, 2011 Filing 67 STIPULATED TENTH MOTION to Join Additional Party Plaintiffs by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(law)
March 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting #65 Stipulated Ninth Motion to Join Additional Party Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 03/22/11. (This is a text only Order.) (eae)
March 21, 2011 Filing 65 STIPULATED NINTH MOTION to Join Additional Party Plaintiffs by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Part 1 of 3), #2 Exhibit 1 (Part 2 of 3), #3 Exhibit 1 (Part 3 of 3))(law)
March 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting #63 Stipulated to Motion to Amend Discovery Schedule/Order. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 03/16/11. (This is a text only Order.)(eae)
March 15, 2011 Filing 63 STIPULATED MOTION to Amend the Discovery Schedule/Order by Jeb Spaulding, State of Vermont, State of Vermont Agency Administration. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Aten, Keith)
March 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting #60 Joint Motion to Substitute Party; granting #61 Joint Motion to Change of Caption. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 03/11/11. (This is a text only Order.)(eae)
March 8, 2011 Filing 61 JOINT MOTION Change of Caption by all parties. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Somers, Thomas) Text clarified on 3/9/2011 (law).
March 8, 2011 Filing 60 JOINT MOTION to Substitute Party as to Neal F. Lunderville by all parties. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Somers, Thomas) Text clarified on 3/9/2011 (law).
March 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting #58 Stipulated Eighth Motion to Join Additional Party Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 03/04/11. (This is a text only Order.)(eae)
March 3, 2011 Filing 58 STIPULATED EIGHTH MOTION to Join Additional Party Plaintiffs by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(law)
February 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting #56 Stipulated Seventh Motion To Join Additional Party Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 02/23/11. (This is a text only Order.)(eae)
February 18, 2011 Filing 56 STIPULATED SEVENTH MOTION to Join Additional Party Plaintiffs by plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(law)
February 15, 2011 Filing 55 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE re: Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories and Requests to Produce by Neale Lunderville, State of Vermont, State of Vermont Agency Administration.(Aten, Keith)
January 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #53 Stipulated Motion to Amend the Discovery Schedule/Order. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 01/28/11. (This is a text only Order.) (eae)
January 26, 2011 Filing 53 STIPULATED MOTION to Amend the Discovery Schedule/Order by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Somers, Thomas) Text clarified, simplified on 1/27/2011 (law).
January 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting #51 Stipulated Sixth Motion To Join Additional Party Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 01/14/11. (This is a text only Order.)(eae)
January 10, 2011 Filing 51 STIPULATED SIXTH MOTION to Join Additional Party Plaintiffs by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Certificate of Service)(law)
December 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATION AND ORDER re: Purposes of Determining Whether or Not There Was a Violation of the Salary Test Pursuant to 16(B) of the Fair Labor Standards Act. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 12/13/2010. (law)
December 10, 2010 Filing 49 JOINT STIPULATION of Representative Plaintiffs for Purposes of Determining Whether or Not There Was A Violation of the Salary Test by all parties. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Somers, Thomas) Modified on 12/12/2010 (law).
December 10, 2010 Filing 48 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE re: Names and adresses of potential class members by Neale Lunderville, State of Vermont Agency Administration.(Aten, Keith)
November 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION AND ORDER of Conditional Certification of a Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. 216 and for Court Authorized Notice to Potential Members of the Collective Action re: #46 Motion for Approval of Stipulation of Conditional Certification as a Collective Action and Motion for Court-Authorized Notice to Potential Class Members. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 11/29/2010. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Pending Overtime Wage Lawsuit and Opportunity to Opt-In)(law)
November 23, 2010 Filing 46 MOTION for Approval of Stipulation of Conditional Certification as a Collective Action and MOTION for Court-Authorized Notice to Potential Class Members by plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(law)
November 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #44 Stipulated Fifth Motion to Join Additional Party Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 11/22/10. (This is a text only Order.)(eae)
November 18, 2010 Filing 44 STIPULATED FIFTH MOTION to Join Additional Party Plaintiffs by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Certificate of Service)(law)
November 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #42 Consented to Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 11/18/10. (This is a text only Order.)(eae)
November 18, 2010 Filing 42 CONSENTED-TO MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney David D. Aman on behalf of Coleen Bean, Elizabeth Beaulieu, Melissa Belrose-West, Thomas A. Benoit, Sr, Roger Bergeron, Jacqueline Bilodeau, Carol E. Blake, Mary P. Bolton, Arthur J. Bombardier, Lara Boutaugh-Commoss, John Brabant, Stephanie Briggs, Lisa Bruce, Daniel O. Bruyette, Deborah Budreau, Kevin F. Burke, Michael Carey, Mary A. Cassani, Thomas E. Chase, Jan W. Ciemiecki, Brigitte Codling, Peter Comart, Sheila Coniff, Victoria Conti, Wanda Cosman, Brenda Dawson Crocket, Beverly A. Croteau, Sharon Crout, Dominic G. Damato, Kenneth Denton, David DiDomenico, Al Dubuque, Tamara Evanson, Nathan Fice, Carl H. Fielder, David Fitts, Jerry Forkin, Stephanie Fuller, Kathryn Gehr, Christine Geiler, Carl W. Gleason, Steven R. Godin, David F. Hale, Arthur Hamlin, Kara Haynes, Peggy S. Heath, Carey Hengstenberg, Evanthia Hill, Margaret Hodder, Robert Hooper, Suzanne Hopkins, Ann P. Horsman, Ken Horssman, David Hosking, Briana Howe, Ian Jenike, William A. Jewell, Robert B. Johnston, Thomas Joslin, Patricia S. Kennelly, Carolyn M. Krug, Lynn LaBonte, Tracy LaFrance, Ronald R. Lafond, Jr, Sandra W. Lambert, Kate Larose, Roger Lathrop, Chris Lazar, Ronald Lemaire, Aaron Lewis, R. Allyn Lewis, Rachael B. Lizotte, Robert Lutz, Jr, Jennifer Lyford, John Mangione, Andrew A. Masson, Jr, Ruth T. Matthews, Elizabeth Maurer, Thomas McFarland, Mari McIntosh, Steven McLaughlin, Alexis M. McLean, Robert McNeil, Matt Messier, Michael Metz, Matthew Moran, Stanley Morse, Sarah Nash, Douglas W. Newton, Dale Norton, Peter M. Oparowski, Michael Orticari, Stephen G. Parise, Frank J. Perricone, Siobhan Perricone, Timothy Pockette, Peter M. Potanas, Ellen Pulsifer, Ginger Radke, Susan E. Ransom-Kelley, Elise Raymond, Cheryl Reed, Emily Reed, John Reese, Jr, Valerie Reynolds-Petitt, Amy Richardson, Dennis Roberts, Jr, Donald Robisky, Margo Rome, Bryan Scrubb, Christopher Seguin, Loren T. Shaw, Lindsay Simpson, Curtis P. Smiley, Monique Sordiff, Leslie Stapleton, Paul O. Stratton, III, Robert Suckert, Ethan Swift, Tracy Tapley, Edward Thomas, Anita Thomason, Daniel A. Thompson, Alyssa Todd, Daniel Towle, Jon P. Turmel, Susan Viens, Jeanette J. VonFeldt, George W. Voss, Laura J. Wallett, Mary Joanne Watson, Scott Wheatley, Greg Wilcox, Christina Wilder, Paul Winters. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Aman, David)
November 15, 2010 Filing 41 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - Interrogatories and Request to Produce by all plaintiffs.(Aman, David) Text clarified on 11/16/2010 (jlh).
November 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 AMENDED STIPULATED DISCOVERY SCHEDULE/ORDER granting #39 Stipulated Motion to Amend the #35 Discovery Schedule/Order. Discovery due by 4/15/2011. Motions due by 4/29/2011. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 2/1/2011 at 09:30 AM. Ready for trial on the issues of the salary test and liquidated damages and willfulness issues relating to the salary test within 60 calendar days after the court's ruling on the motions for summary judgment. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 11/10/2010. (law)
November 9, 2010 Filing 39 STIPULATED MOTION to Amend the #35 Discovery Schedule/Order by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Certificate of Service)(Aman, David) Text clarified on 11/10/2010 (jlh).
October 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #34 Joint Motion to Substitute Stipulated Proposed Discovery Schedule/Order. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 10/22/10. (This is a text only Order.)(eae)
October 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #32 Stipulated Fourth Motion to Join Additional Party Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 10/20/10. (This is a text only Order.) (eae)
October 20, 2010 Filing 36 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - Initial Disclosures by Neale Lunderville, State of Vermont, State of Vermont Agency Administration.(Aten, Keith)
October 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATED DISCOVERY SCHEDULE/ORDER Discovery due by 4/15/2011. Motions due by 4/29/2011. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 2/1/2011 at 09:30 AM. Ready for trial on the issues of salary test and liquidated damages and willfulness issues relating to the salary test within 60 days after the court's ruling on motions for summary judgment. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 10/20/2010. (law)
October 20, 2010 Filing 34 JOINT MOTION to Substitute Proposed Discovery Schedule/Order by Elizabeth Beaulieu, Melissa Belrose-West, Thomas A. Benoit, Sr, Roger Bergeron, Jacqueline Bilodeau, Lara Boutaugh-Commoss, Stephanie Briggs, Lisa Bruce, Deborah Budreau, Kevin F. Burke, Michael Carey, Thomas E. Chase, Brigitte Codling, Peter Comart, Sheila Coniff, Victoria Conti, Wanda Cosman, Brenda Dawson Crocket, Beverly A. Croteau, Kenneth Denton, David DiDomenico, Al Dubuque, ENE Evaluator, Tamara Evanson, Nathan Fice, Carl H. Fielder, Jerry Forkin, Christine Geiler, Carl W. Gleason, Steven R. Godin, Arthur Hamlin, Kara Haynes, Evanthia Hill, Margaret Hodder, Robert Hooper, Ann P. Horsman, Ken Horssman, David Hosking, Briana Howe, Ian Jenike, Robert B. Johnston, Thomas Joslin, Tracy LaFrance, Roger Lathrop, Chris Lazar, Ronald Lemaire, Aaron Lewis, R. Allyn Lewis, Neale Lunderville, Robert Lutz, Jr, Jennifer Lyford, John Mangione, Ruth T. Matthews, Elizabeth Maurer, Thomas McFarland, Steven McLaughlin, Alexis M. McLean, Michael Metz, Matthew Moran, Stanley Morse, Sarah Nash, Dale Norton, Peter M. Oparowski, Michael Orticari, Stephen G. Parise, Frank J. Perricone, Siobhan Perricone, Timothy Pockette, Susan E. Ransom-Kelley, Elise Raymond, Emily Reed, John Reese, Jr, Valerie Reynolds-Petitt, Amy Richardson, Dennis Roberts, Jr, Donald Robisky, Margo Rome, Curtis P. Smiley, Monique Sordiff, State of Vermont, State of Vermont Agency Administration, Paul O. Stratton, III, Robert Suckert, Ethan Swift, Tracy Tapley, Edward Thomas, Anita Thomason, Daniel A. Thompson, Alyssa Todd, Daniel Towle, Mary Joanne Watson, Scott Wheatley, Greg Wilcox, Christina Wilder, Paul Winters. (Attachments: #1 Stipulated Proposed Discovery Schedule/Order)(Somers, Thomas) Text clarified on 10/25/2010 (jlh).
October 14, 2010 Filing 33 ENE By Stipulation re: Evaluator Selection by all parties.(Somers, Thomas)
October 8, 2010 Filing 32 STIPULATED FOURTH MOTION to Join Additional Party Plaintiffs by Elizabeth Beaulieu, Melissa Belrose-West, Thomas A. Benoit, Sr, Roger Bergeron, Jacqueline Bilodeau, Lara Boutaugh-Commoss, Stephanie Briggs, Lisa Bruce, Deborah Budreau, Kevin F. Burke, Michael Carey, Thomas E. Chase, Brigitte Codling, Peter Comart, Sheila Coniff, Victoria Conti, Wanda Cosman, Brenda Dawson Crocket, Beverly A. Croteau, Kenneth Denton, David DiDomenico, Al Dubuque, Tamara Evanson, Nathan Fice, Carl H. Fielder, Jerry Forkin, Christine Geiler, Carl W. Gleason, Steven R. Godin, Arthur Hamlin, Kara Haynes, Evanthia Hill, Margaret Hodder, Robert Hooper, Ann P. Horsman, Ken Horssman, David Hosking, Briana Howe, Ian Jenike, Robert B. Johnston, Thomas Joslin, Tracy LaFrance, Roger Lathrop, Chris Lazar, Ronald Lemaire, Aaron Lewis, R. Allyn Lewis, Robert Lutz, Jr, Jennifer Lyford, John Mangione, Ruth T. Matthews, Elizabeth Maurer, Thomas McFarland, Steven McLaughlin, Alexis M. McLean, Michael Metz, Matthew Moran, Stanley Morse, Sarah Nash, Dale Norton, Peter M. Oparowski, Michael Orticari, Stephen G. Parise, Frank J. Perricone, Siobhan Perricone, Timothy Pockette, Susan E. Ransom-Kelley, Elise Raymond, Emily Reed, John Reese, Jr, Valerie Reynolds-Petitt, Amy Richardson, Dennis Roberts, Jr, Donald Robisky, Margo Rome, Curtis P. Smiley, Monique Sordiff, Paul O. Stratton, III, Robert Suckert, Ethan Swift, Tracy Tapley, Edward Thomas, Anita Thomason, Daniel A. Thompson, Alyssa Todd, Daniel Towle, Mary Joanne Watson, Scott Wheatley, Greg Wilcox, Christina Wilder, Paul Winters. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Certificate of Service)(law)
October 8, 2010 Filing 31 LETTER re: #27 proposed Stipulated Discovery Schedule/Order non-compliant with Local Rules 16.1(b)(1)(A), 26(a)(3)(I). Counsel to re-submit a new Discovery schedule by 10/18/2010. (law)
October 7, 2010 Filing 30 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - Initial Disclosures by Elizabeth Beaulieu, Melissa Belrose-West, Thomas A. Benoit, Sr, Roger Bergeron, Jacqueline Bilodeau, Lara Boutaugh-Commoss, Stephanie Briggs, Lisa Bruce, Deborah Budreau, Kevin F. Burke, Michael Carey, Thomas E. Chase, Brigitte Codling, Peter Comart, Sheila Coniff, Victoria Conti, Wanda Cosman, Brenda Dawson Crocket, Beverly A. Croteau, Kenneth Denton, David DiDomenico, Al Dubuque, Tamara Evanson, Nathan Fice, Carl H. Fielder, Jerry Forkin, Christine Geiler, Carl W. Gleason, Steven R. Godin, Arthur Hamlin, Kara Haynes, Evanthia Hill, Margaret Hodder, Robert Hooper, Ann P. Horsman, Ken Horssman, David Hosking, Briana Howe, Ian Jenike, Robert B. Johnston, Thomas Joslin, Tracy LaFrance, Roger Lathrop, Chris Lazar, Ronald Lemaire, Aaron Lewis, R. Allyn Lewis, Robert Lutz, Jr, Jennifer Lyford, John Mangione, Ruth T. Matthews, Elizabeth Maurer, Thomas McFarland, Steven McLaughlin, Alexis M. McLean, Michael Metz, Matthew Moran, Stanley Morse, Sarah Nash, Dale Norton, Peter M. Oparowski, Michael Orticari, Stephen G. Parise, Frank J. Perricone, Siobhan Perricone, Timothy Pockette, Susan E. Ransom-Kelley, Elise Raymond, Emily Reed, John Reese, Jr, Valerie Reynolds-Petitt, Amy Richardson, Dennis Roberts, Jr, Donald Robisky, Margo Rome, Curtis P. Smiley, Monique Sordiff, Paul O. Stratton, III, Robert Suckert, Ethan Swift, Tracy Tapley, Edward Thomas, Anita Thomason, Daniel A. Thompson, Alyssa Todd, Daniel Towle, Mary Joanne Watson, Scott Wheatley, Greg Wilcox, Christina Wilder, Paul Winters.(Somers, Thomas)
September 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 Stipulated Third Motion to Join Additional Parties. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 09/21/10. (This is a text only Order.)(eae)
September 20, 2010 Filing 28 STIPULATED THIRD MOTION to Join Additional Party Plaintiffs by Elizabeth Beaulieu, Melissa Belrose-West, Thomas A. Benoit, Sr, Roger Bergeron, Jacqueline Bilodeau, Lara Boutaugh-Commoss, Stephanie Briggs, Deborah Budreau, Michael Carey, Thomas E. Chase, Sheila Coniff, Victoria Conti, Wanda Cosman, Brenda Dawson Crocket, Kenneth Denton, David DiDomenico, Al Dubuque, Tamara Evanson, Nathan Fice, Carl H. Fielder, Jerry Forkin, Arthur Hamlin, Kara Haynes, Evanthia Hill, Margaret Hodder, Robert Hooper, Ann P. Horsman, Ken Horssman, Briana Howe, Ian Jenike, Thomas Joslin, Tracy LaFrance, Chris Lazar, Ronald Lemaire, Aaron Lewis, R. Allyn Lewis, Robert Lutz, Jr, Jennifer Lyford, John Mangione, Elizabeth Maurer, Thomas McFarland, Steven McLaughlin, Alexis M. McLean, Michael Metz, Matthew Moran, Stanley Morse, Sarah Nash, Dale Norton, Michael Orticari, Frank J. Perricone, Siobhan Perricone, Timothy Pockette, Susan E. Ransom-Kelley, Elise Raymond, Emily Reed, John Reese, Jr, Amy Richardson, Dennis Roberts, Jr, Donald Robisky, Margo Rome, Monique Sordiff, Paul O. Stratton, III, Robert Suckert, Ethan Swift, Tracy Tapley, Anita Thomason, Alyssa Todd, Daniel Towle, Mary Joanne Watson, Scott Wheatley, Greg Wilcox, Christina Wilder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Certificate of Service)(law)
September 7, 2010 Filing 27 PROPOSED Stipulated Discovery Schedule/Order by Neale Lunderville, State of Vermont, State of Vermont Agency Administration.(Aten, Keith)
August 23, 2010 Filing 26 ANSWER to #13 Second Amended Collective Action Complaint with Jury Demand by Neale Lunderville, State of Vermont, State of Vermont Agency Administration. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Aten, Keith)
August 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying #9 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. Joint Proposed Discovery Schedule due within 30 days. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 8/5/2010. (law)
July 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #22 Stipulated Second Motion To Join Additional Party Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 07/29/10. (This is a text only Order.)(eae)
July 28, 2010 Filing 23 TRANSCRIPT of Motion to Dismiss Hearing held on 7/9/2010 before Judge Sessions. Court Reporter Anne E. Nichols, Telephone number 802-860-2227. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/19/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/30/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/28/2010. (jam)
July 22, 2010 Filing 22 STIPULATED SECOND MOTION to Join Additional Party Plaintiffs by Elizabeth Beaulieu, Melissa Belrose-West, Thomas A. Benoit, Sr, Jacqueline Bilodeau, Stephanie Briggs, Deborah Budreau, Thomas E. Chase, Sheila Coniff, Brenda Dawson Crocket, Kenneth Denton, David DiDomenico, Tamara Evanson, Nathan Fice, Carl H. Fielder, Jerry Forkin, Arthur Hamlin, Kara Haynes, Evanthia Hill, Margaret Hodder, Robert Hooper, Ann P. Horsman, Ian Jenike, Tracy LaFrance, Chris Lazar, Ronald Lemaire, Aaron Lewis, Robert Lutz, Jr, John Mangione, Elizabeth Maurer, Thomas McFarland, Steven McLaughlin, Alexis M. McLean, Michael Metz, Matthew Moran, Stanley Morse, Sarah Nash, Michael Orticari, Frank J. Perricone, Siobhan Perricone, Susan E. Ransom-Kelley, Elise Raymond, Emily Reed, John Reese, Jr, Amy Richardson, Dennis Roberts, Jr, Monique Sordiff, Paul O. Stratton, III, Robert Suckert, Tracy Tapley, Anita Thomason, Alyssa Todd, Mary Joanne Watson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Certificate of Service)(law)
July 9, 2010 Filing 21 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge William K. Sessions III: Motion Hearing held on 7/9/2010. T. Somers & K. Stackpole present for pltf; S. Collier & K. Aten present for dfts. Court makes inquiries. Statements by counsel. Motion Taken Under Advisement: #9 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. (Court Reporter: Nichols) (jam)
June 30, 2010 Filing 20 NOTICE of Hearing re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 7/9/2010 09:30 AM in Burlington Courtroom 542 before Judge William K. Sessions III. (jam)
June 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Stipulated First Motion to Join Additional Party Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 06/29/10. (This is a text only Order.)(eae)
May 27, 2010 Filing 18 STIPULATED FIRST MOTION to Join Additional Party Plaintiffs by Elizabeth Beaulieu, Melissa Belrose-West, Jacqueline Bilodeau, Stephanie Briggs, Thomas E. Chase, Sheila Coniff, Kenneth Denton, David DiDomenico, Nathan Fice, Jerry Forkin, Arthur Hamlin, Kara Haynes, Evanthia Hill, Margaret Hodder, Robert Hooper, Ian Jenike, Chris Lazar, Ronald Lemaire, Robert Lutz, Jr, Elizabeth Maurer, Thomas McFarland, Steven McLaughlin, Michael Metz, Matthew Moran, Stanley Morse, Sarah Nash, Michael Orticari, Susan E. Ransom-Kelley, Emily Reed, John Reese, Jr, Amy Richardson, Dennis Roberts, Jr, Monique Sordiff, Robert Suckert, Tracy Tapley, Anita Thomason, Alyssa Todd, Mary Joanne Watson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(law) Modified on 5/27/2010 (law).
May 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 05/10/10. (This is a text only Order.)(eae)
May 4, 2010 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to #9 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Neale Lunderville, State of Vermont, State of Vermont Agency Administration. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Collier, Steven)
May 3, 2010 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Neale Lunderville, State of Vermont, State of Vermont Agency Administration. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Collier, Steven)
April 14, 2010 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition to #9 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Elizabeth Beaulieu, Melissa Belrose-West, Jacqueline Bilodeau, Stephanie Briggs, Thomas E. Chase, Sheila Coniff, Kenneth Denton, David DiDomenico, Nathan Fice, Jerry Forkin, Arthur Hamlin, Kara Haynes, Evanthia Hill, Margaret Hodder, Robert Hooper, Ian Jenike, Chris Lazar, Ronald Lemaire, Robert Lutz, Jr, Elizabeth Maurer, Thomas McFarland, Steven McLaughlin, Michael Metz, Matthew Moran, Stanley Morse, Sarah Nash, Michael Orticari, Susan E. Ransom-Kelley, Emily Reed, John Reese, Jr, Amy Richardson, Dennis Roberts, Jr, Monique Sordiff, Robert Suckert, Tracy Tapley, Anita Thomason, Alyssa Todd, Mary Joanne Watson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(law)
April 14, 2010 Filing 13 SECOND AMENDED COLLECTIVE ACTION COMPLAINT against Neale Lunderville, State of Vermont, State of Vermont Agency Administration filed by Anita Thomason, Robert Suckert, Elizabeth Maurer, David DiDomenico, Michael Orticari, Ronald Lemaire, Melissa Belrose-West, Elizabeth Beaulieu, Robert Lutz, Jr, Dennis Roberts, Jr, Chris Lazar, Emily Reed, Sarah Nash, John Reese, Jr, Steven McLaughlin, Robert Hooper, Stanley Morse, Arthur Hamlin, Monique Sordiff, Kara Haynes, Michael Metz, Matthew Moran, Amy Richardson, Kenneth Denton, Jacqueline Bilodeau, Jerry Forkin, Evanthia Hill, Susan E. Ransom-Kelley, Nathan Fice, Stephanie Briggs, Alyssa Todd, Thomas McFarland, Sheila Coniff, Mary Joanne Watson, Thomas Chase, Ian Jenike, Tracy Tapley, Margaret Hodder (she's not in caption but in body). (Attachments: #1 Consents, #2 Certificate of Service)(law) Filers added on 4/15/2010 (law)
March 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 Motion to Dismiss; granting #11 Joint Motion to Extend Time for Defendants' deadline to respond to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories and Requests to Produce until thirty (30) days after the date for mandatory disclosures. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 03/23/10. (This is a text only Order.) (eae)
March 16, 2010 Filing 11 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint and JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time re: Discovery by Elizabeth Beaulieu, Melissa Belrose-West, Jacqueline Bilodeau, Stephanie Briggs, Sheila Confiff, Kenneth Denton, David DiDomenico, Nathan Fice, Jerry Forkin, Arthur Hamlin, Kara Haynes, Evanthia Hill, Margaret Hodder, Robert Hooper, Chris Lazar, Ronald Lemaire, Robert Lutz, Jr, Elizabeth Maurer, Thomas McFarland, Steven McLaughlin, Michael Metz, Matthew Moran, Stanley Morse, Sarah Nash, Michael Orticari, Susan E. Ransom-Kelley, Emily Reed, John Reese, Jr, Amy Richardson, Dennis Roberts, Jr, Monique Sordiff, Robert Suckert, Anita Thomason, Alyssa Todd. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Somers, Thomas). MOTION relief added on 3/17/2010 (jlh).
February 16, 2010 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven C. Collier on behalf of Neale Lunderville, State of Vermont, State of Vermont Agency Administration. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Collier, Steven)
February 16, 2010 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Neale Lunderville, State of Vermont, State of Vermont Agency Administration. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Collier, Steven)
February 10, 2010 Filing 8 DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - First SEt of Interrogatories and Requests to Produce by Elizabeth Beaulieu, Melissa Belrose-West, Jacqueline Bilodeau, Stephanie Briggs, Sheila Confiff, Kenneth Denton, David DiDomenico, Nathan Fice, Jerry Forkin, Arthur Hamlin, Kara Haynes, Evanthia Hill, Margaret Hodder, Robert Hooper, Chris Lazar, Ronald Lemaire, Robert Lutz, Jr, Elizabeth Maurer, Thomas McFarland, Steven McLaughlin, Michael Metz, Matthew Moran, Stanley Morse, Sarah Nash, Michael Orticari, Susan E. Ransom-Kelley, Emily Reed, John Reese, Jr, Amy Richardson, Dennis Roberts, Jr, Monique Sordiff, Robert Suckert, Anita Thomason, Alyssa Todd. (originally filed 1/21/2010 in state court) (law)
February 10, 2010 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Neale Lunderville served on 1/25/2010, answer due 2/16/2010. (originally filed 1/28/2010 in state court) (law)
February 10, 2010 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. State of Vermont Agency Administration served on 1/25/2010, answer due 2/16/2010. (originally filed 1/28/2010 in state court) (law)
February 10, 2010 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. State of Vermont served on 1/25/2010, answer due 2/16/2010. (originally filed 1/28/10 in state court) (law)
February 10, 2010 Filing 4 FIRST AMENDED COLLECTIVE ACTION COMPLAINT Under 16 of the Fair Labor Standards Act for Declaratory Relief, Injunctive Relief, Damages and Attorney Fees against Neale Lunderville, State of Vermont, State of Vermont Agency Administration filed by Anita Thomason, Robert Suckert, Elizabeth Maurer, David DiDomenico, Michael Orticari, Ronald Lemaire, Melissa Belrose-West, Elizabeth Beaulieu, Robert Lutz, Jr, Dennis Roberts, Jr, Chris Lazar, Emily Reed, Sarah Nash, John Reese, Jr, Steven McLaughlin, Robert Hooper, Stanley Morse, Arthur Hamlin, Monique Sordiff, Kara Haynes, Michael Metz, Margaret Hodder, Matthew Moran, Amy Richardson, Kenneth Denton, Jacqueline Bilodeau, Jerry Forkin, Evanthia Hill, Susan E. Ransom-Kelley, Nathan Fice, Stephanie Briggs, Alyssa Todd, Thomas McFarland, Sheila Confiff. (Attachments: #1 Consent of Sarah Nash) (originally filed 1/21/2010 in state court)(law)
February 10, 2010 Filing 3 COLLECTIVE ACTION COMPLAINT Under 16 of the Fair Labor Standards Act for Declaratory Relief, Injunctive Relief, Damages and Attorney Fees against Neale Lunderville, State of Vermont, State of Vermont Agency Administration filed by Anita Thomason, Robert Suckert, Elizabeth Maurer, David DiDomenico, Michael Orticari, Ronald Lemaire, Melissa Belrose-West, Elizabeth Beaulieu, Robert Lutz, Jr, Dennis Roberts, Jr, Chris Lazar, Emily Reed, Sarah Nash, John Reese, Jr, Steven McLaughlin, Robert Hooper, Stanley Morse, Arthur Hamlin, Monique Sordiff, Kara Haynes, Michael Metz, Margaret Hodder, Matthew Moran, Amy Richardson, Kenneth Denton, Jacqueline Bilodeau, Jerry Forkin, Evanthia Hill, Susan E. Ransom-Kelley, Nathan Fice, Stephanie Briggs, Alyssa Todd, Thomas McFarland, Sheila Confiff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33) (originally filed 1/7/2010 in state court) (law)
February 8, 2010 Filing 2 LETTERto Washington County Superior Court requesting original case file & certified docket sheet. (law)
February 8, 2010 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State of Vermont, State of Vermont Agency Administration, Neale Lunderville from Washington County Superior Court, case number 10-1-10 Wncv. ( Filing fee $ 350) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(law)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coniff et al v. State of Vermont et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neil W. Aguiar
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy M. Blanchard
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas R. Burke
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominic G. Damato
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: David D. Aman, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Howe
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: David D. Aman, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula Catherine
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bille J. Raymond
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James A. Farrell
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn R. Richards
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Towle
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: David D. Aman, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elliott M. Benay
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie L. Caduto
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monique Sordiff
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: David D. Aman, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie A. Trottier
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen B. McEwing
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Austin
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen C. Palmer
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth M. Manfredi
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John J. Demeter
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. Douglas Dows
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth T. Matthews
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: David D. Aman, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ed Wageman
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth A. Robie
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: David D. Aman, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad A. Allen
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Jaworski
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bennett S. Truman
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory D. Kelly
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: David D. Aman, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney I. Pingree
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Robson
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly H. LaMonda
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory M. Maguire
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol R. Rose
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvin A. Simard
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason G. Boyd
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura E. Ewell
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gholam-Ray Marzbani
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rae Hirst
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adele Edelman
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vaughn D. Works
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aula E. DeWitt
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny R. Landry
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aime E. Cloutier
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsay Simpson
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: David D. Aman, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert McNeil
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: David D. Aman, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lara Boutaugh-Commoss
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: David D. Aman, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Blake
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne Bordonaro
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Marinelli
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caroline M. Haag-Marsh
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosemary C. Walsh
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre V. Thibault
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda A. Merchant
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory L. Miller
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca V. Spaulding
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Hodder
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: David D. Aman, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Lou Hood
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glen M. Torres
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward A. Jackson
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Smith
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank J. Perricone
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: David D. Aman, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas A. Powell
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessanne Wyman
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kara Pallman
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luke B. Purvis
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard Cave
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: David D. Aman, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Tapley
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: David D. Aman, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice G. Leonard
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin J. Stapleton
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Pinard
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terri L. Tibbetts
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daly J. Walter
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: David D. Aman, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan J. Moir
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Conti
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: David D. Aman, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brigitte Codling
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: David D. Aman, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Lawsing
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: David D. Aman, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie-Michele Joyal
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coleen Bean
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: David D. Aman, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark A. Bissonnette
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Winters
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: David D. Aman, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah A. Caruso
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alydia Payette
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur J. Bombardier
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: David D. Aman, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rob Lowe
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce A. Martell
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J. Fowler
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janette L. Floyd
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol L. Lipani
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim A. Wittorff
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrance P. Greenwood
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah A. Caldbeck
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexis M. McLean
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: David D. Aman, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen A. Crampton
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth R. Demers
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest A. Laird
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard A. Barany
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Les Wilder
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: David D. Aman, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane E. Menard
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan F. Grzych
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerold Noyes
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: David D. Aman, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura L. Cornell
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Haslett
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan E. Wemple
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy S. Wilson
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Crout
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: David D. Aman, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis P. Smiley
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: David D. Aman, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwight Robtoy
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: David D. Aman, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel W. Champney
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra E. Hunt
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Helen Jordan
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin M. Mcsweeney
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce B. Epstein
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie L. Mckeighan
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine E. LaBarre
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert C. King
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul E. Frederick
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanne M. Neal
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erica Aubut
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Jean Boardman
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas W. Newton
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: David D. Aman, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa J. Johnson
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Spear
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene R. Allen
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth W. McNamara
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Hodgson
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer May Lilley
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles C. Tatro
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurie E. Greenwood
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellen Pulsifer
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: David D. Aman, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Frederick Dunham, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hilary J. Denton
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly J. Prior
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy LaFrance
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: David D. Aman, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia K. Johnson
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine J. Plummer
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Brett
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Fuller
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: David D. Aman, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly G. Connelley
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael R. LaClair
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eunice H. Froeliger
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: David D. Aman, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ebony V. Nyoni (Kirkland)
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel A. Thompson
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: David D. Aman, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alyssa Todd
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: David D. Aman, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle L. LaPerle
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Lathrop
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: David D. Aman, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa DeBlois
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: David D. Aman, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richmond H. Hopkins, III
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy S. Heath
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: David D. Aman, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen S. Rifenburg
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene J. Bifano
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janis L. Appel
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trini L. Barssard
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: David D. Aman, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia Buzzell
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: David D. Aman, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian C. Roberts
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Wilder
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Isabelle
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James J. Ryan
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark W. Smith
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivy Harris
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Steven Litkovitz
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark H. Jones
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John M. Johnston
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Roth
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: And L. Morse
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert J. Drawbaugh
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah W. Ferrell
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven P. Smith
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim K. Revoir
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J. Wood
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth L. Ross-Mobbs
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer B. Egelhof
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy A. Trombley
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Marie Hetzel
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David F. Hale
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: David D. Aman, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn M. Krug
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: David D. Aman, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy A. Mirro
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Price
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Feulner
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip L. Jones
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Hosking
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: David D. Aman, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Reed
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: David D. Aman, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary P. Bolton
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: David D. Aman, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Wild
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelly AC Thayer
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Lowell Landis
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: David D. Aman, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Hamlin
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: David D. Aman, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katie A. Derosier
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brad R. Epstein
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Sotirakis
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Morse
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: David D. Aman, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen Keith
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert B. Johnston
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: David D. Aman, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael W. Young
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael W. Peterson
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Shaefer
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet K. Dunigan
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary E. Koen
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie L. Tucker
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan L. Pinto
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank J. Malnati, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Lyn Pfister
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan E. Ransom-Kelley
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: David D. Aman, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Comart
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: David D. Aman, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard P. Greenwood
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Maurer
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: David D. Aman, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne M. Porter
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Lyford
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: David D. Aman, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katrina Mouquin
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilhelmina L. Picard
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly S. Bean
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elise Raymond
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: David D. Aman, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janine Parker
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Olson
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa L. Racine
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Suckert
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: David D. Aman, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Briggs
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: David D. Aman, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret E. Wilson
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David M. Trombley
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine M. McNamara
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur E. Danyow, III
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy A. Laraway
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Brabant
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: David D. Aman, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis J. Mullins, III
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard J. Byrne
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: David D. Aman, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas E. Petterson
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maureen H. Montgomery
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin F. Burke
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: David D. Aman, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John L. Hoy
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond C. Kellett
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Forkin
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: David D. Aman, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin W. Oddy
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leah I. Korce
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen M. Flynn
Represented By: Thomas H. Somers, Esq.
Represented By: Kerin E. Stackpole, Esq.
Represented By: Adam P. Bergeron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]