Drake et al v. Allergan, Inc.

Plaintiff: Kevin Drake and Lori Drake
Defendant: Allergan, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2013cv00234
Filed: September 3, 2013
Court: Vermont District Court
Office: Burlington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William K. Sessions
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 29, 2014 139 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying 124 MOTION to Compel Production of Materials Relating to Plaintiffs' Expert Dr. David Kessler. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 10/29/2014. (hbc)
October 31, 2014 153 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying 94 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 10/31/2014. (law)
May 22, 2015 212 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting 206 Motion for Judgment on Verdict; denying 207 Post-trial Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law or, in the alternative, MOTION for New Trial. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 5/22/2015. (law)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Drake et al v. Allergan, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Drake
Represented By: Katherine L. Amestoy, Esq.
Represented By: Leo A. Bisson, Jr., Esq.
Represented By: Ray C. Chester, Esq.
Represented By: Andrew M. Edge, Esq.
Represented By: Stephen M. Orsinger, Esq.
Represented By: Brian T. Thompson, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Drake
Represented By: Katherine L. Amestoy, Esq.
Represented By: Leo A. Bisson, Jr., Esq.
Represented By: Ray C. Chester, Esq.
Represented By: Andrew M. Edge, Esq.
Represented By: Stephen M. Orsinger, Esq.
Represented By: Brian T. Thompson, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.