Chuderski v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Noel Chuderski
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2018cv00127
Filed: August 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Office: Burlington Office
County: Rutland
Presiding Judge: John M Conroy
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Commissioner, Social Security Administration served on 8/17/2018, answer due 10/16/2018. (Attachments: #1 Certified USPS Receipts)(Massicotte, Kelly) Text clarified on 9/17/2018 (jlh).
August 17, 2018 Filing 4 CONSENT to Direct Assignment by Noel Chuderski. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (eh)
August 8, 2018 ISSUED Summons as to Commissioner, Social Security Administration., ISSUED Local Rule 73 Forms. (eh)
August 7, 2018 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Commissioner, Social Security Administration filed by Noel Chuderski. (eh)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 8/7/2018. (This is a text-only Order.) (eh)
August 7, 2018 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed in Forma Pauperis filed by Noel Chuderski. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #2 Redacted Complaint (Image is sealed), #3 Unredacted Complaint (Image is sealed), #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (eh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chuderski v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noel Chuderski
Represented By: Kelly E. Massicotte, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?