Qureshi et al v. People's United Financial, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Jose Antonio Pietri, Phillip Calderwood, Jose R. Casseres-Pinto, Almasood Qureshi Alexandre Daccache, Carlos Enrique Hiller Sanchez, Tongyi Wang and Almasood Qureshi
Defendant: People's United Bank, People's United Financial, Inc., Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp, LLP, David B. Gordon, David B. Gordon, A Processional Corporation and David B. Gordon, A Professional Corporation
Case Number: 2:2018cv00163
Filed: October 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Christina Reiss
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2018 Filing 27 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Christina Reiss: Motion Hearing held on 11/19/2018 re #3 MOTION to Appoint Interim Class Counsel. Harley Tropin, Esq., Lisa Shelkrot, Esq., Tal Lifshitz, Esq. present for pltf. Jeff Schneider, Esq. present for Receiver, Michael Goldberg. James Stricker, Esq., John Kennelly, Esq., and Michael Donofrio, Esq., present for dft. Court makes inquiries. Statements by counsel. ORDERED: granting #3 MOTION to Appoint Interim Class Counsel. See doc. #26 . (Court Reporter: Anne Pierce) (jbr)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #3 MOTION to Appoint Interim Class Counsel. The law firm of Kozyak Tropin & Throckmorton, LLP is hereby appointed as Interim Class Counsel. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 11/19/2018. (pac)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING #24 Motion of Paul Aiello, Esq., Michael Bennett, Esq., Daniel C. Girard, Esq., and Angelica M. Ornelas, Esq. for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 11/19/2018. (This is a text-only Order.) (ejh)
November 14, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #22 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Jose R. Casseres-Pinto, Jose Antonio Pietri, Almasood Qureshi, Carlos Enrique Hiller Sanchez, Tongyi Wang, Phillip Calderwood. Exhibit A has been replaced to remove the double-PDF header. The corrected document is now attached to #22 and this entry. (law)
November 13, 2018 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to #3 MOTION to Appoint Interim Class Counsel filed by Phillip Calderwood, Jose R. Casseres-Pinto, Carlos Enrique Hiller Sanchez, Jose Antonio Pietri, Almasood Qureshi, Tongyi Wang. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit A)(Shelkrot, Lisa) (Attachment 2 replaced on 11/14/2018) (law).
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING #20 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #3 Motion to Appoint Interim Class Counsel. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 11/9/2018. (This is a text-only Order.) (ejh)
November 8, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 MOTION to Appoint Interim Class Counsel (unopposed) filed by Phillip Calderwood, Jose R. Casseres-Pinto, Carlos Enrique Hiller Sanchez, Jose Antonio Pietri, Almasood Qureshi, Tongyi Wang. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Shelkrot, Lisa)
November 7, 2018 Filing 24 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Paul Aiello, Michael Bennett, Daniel C. Girard, Angelica M. Ornelas filed by Phillip Calderwood, Jose R. Casseres-Pinto, Carlos Enrique Hiller Sanchez, Jose Antonio Pietri, Almasood Qureshi, Tongyi Wang. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Paul Aiello, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Affidavit of Michael P. Bennett, #4 Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Affidavit of Daniel C. Girard, #6 Exhibit A, #7 Affidavit of Angelica M. Ornelas, #8 Exhibit A)(jlh)
November 6, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Non-Opposition by Almasood Qureshi Alexandre Daccache, Phillip Calderwood, Jose R. Casseres-Pinto, Carlos Enrique Hiller Sanchez, Jose Antonio Pietri, Tongyi Wang re #3 MOTION to Appoint Interim Class Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Shelkrot, Lisa)
November 6, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Hearing re: #3 MOTION to Appoint Interim Class Counsel. Motion Hearing set for 11/19/2018 at 10:00 AM in Burlington Courtroom 542 before Judge Christina Reiss.(jbr)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING #15 Motion of James J. Stricker, Esq. for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 11/1/2018. (This is a text-only Order.) (ejh)
November 1, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael N. Donofrio, Esq on behalf of David B. Gordon, A Professional Corporation, David B. Gordon, Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp, LLP, Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp, LLP(as successor-in-interest to Richardson & Patel, LLP).(Donofrio, Michael)
October 31, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of James J. Stricker filed by People's United Bank, People's United Financial, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificates of Good Standing)(law)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING #12 Consented-to Motion for Extension of Time to Answer until December 7, 2018. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 10/31/2018. (This is a text-only Order.) (ejh)
October 30, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY REMOVAL. Document 10 has been removed from the docket as the documents can not be filed electronically. (jlh)
October 30, 2018 Filing 12 CONSENTED-TO MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by David B. Gordon, A Professional Corporation, David B. Gordon, Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp, LLP, Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp, LLP(as successor-in-interest to Richardson & Patel, LLP).(Asay, Bridget)
October 30, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bridget C. Asay, Esq on behalf of David B. Gordon, A Professional Corporation, David B. Gordon, Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp, LLP, Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp, LLP(as successor-in-interest to Richardson & Patel, LLP).(Asay, Bridget)
October 30, 2018 Filing 10 Entry has been removed from the docket as it can not be filed electronically.
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion of Harley S. Tropin, Esq., Tal J. Lifshitz, Esq., Rachel Sullivan, Esq., and Maia Aron, Esq. for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 10/29/2018. (This is a text-only Order.) (ejh)
October 26, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #4 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Harley S. Tropin, Tal J. Lifshitz, Rachel Sullivan, Maia Aron filed by Jose R. Casseres-Pinto, Jose Antonio Pietri, Almasood Qureshi Alexandre Daccache, Carlos Enrique Hiller Sanchez, Tongyi Wang, Phillip Calderwood. The main document has been replaced to correct the date filed. The corrected document is now attached to #4 and this entry. (law)
October 26, 2018 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Appoint Interim Class Counsel filed by People's United Bank, People's United Financial, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kennelly, John)
October 23, 2018 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT/ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE as to David B. Gordon, A Professional Corporation, David B. Gordon, Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp, LLP, People's United Bank, Peopple's United Financial, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Shelkrot, Lisa) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/8/2018) (jlh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/8/2018: #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E) (jlh).
October 22, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #4 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Harley S. Tropin, Tal J. Lifshitz, Rachel Sullivan, Maia Aron filed by Jose R. Casseres-Pinto, Jose Antonio Pietri, Almasood Qureshi Alexandre Daccache, Carlos Enrique Hiller Sanchez, Tongyi Wang, Phillip Calderwood. The Certificate of Good Standing as to Maia Aron was not uploaded at the time of entry. It is now attached to #4 and this entry. (law)
October 12, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Harley S. Tropin, Tal J. Lifshitz, Rachel Sullivan, Maia Aron filed by Almasood Qureshi Alexandre Daccache, Phillip Calderwood, Jose R. Casseres-Pinto, Carlos Enrique Hiller Sanchez, Jose Antonio Pietri, Tongyi Wang. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Harley S. Tropin, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Affidavit of Tal J. Lifshitz, #4 Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Affidavit of Rachel Sullivan, #6 Certificate of Good Standing, #7 Affidavit of Maia Aron)(jlh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/22/2018: #8 Certificate of Good Standing) (law) (Main Document 4 replaced on 10/26/2018) (law).
October 12, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Interim Class Counsel filed by Almasood Qureshi Alexandre Daccache, Phillip Calderwood, Jose R. Casseres-Pinto, Carlos Enrique Hiller Sanchez, Jose Antonio Pietri, Tongyi Wang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(Shelkrot, Lisa)
October 5, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lisa B. Shelkrot, Esq on behalf of Almasood Qureshi Alexandre Daccache, Phillip Calderwood, Jose R. Casseres-Pinto, Carlos Enrique Hiller Sanchez, Jose Antonio Pietri, Tongyi Wang.(law)
October 5, 2018 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against David B. Gordon, A Professional Corporation, David B. Gordon, Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp, LLP, Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp, LLP(as successor-in-interest to Richardson & Patel, LLP), People's United Bank, People's United Financial, Inc. filed by Tongyi Wang, Carlos Enrique Hiller Sanchez, Jose Antonio Pietri, Jose R. Casseres-Pinto, Almasood Qureshi, Alexandre Daccache, Phillip Calderwood. Summonses issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(law)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Qureshi et al v. People's United Financial, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Antonio Pietri
Represented By: Lisa B. Shelkrot, Esq.
Represented By: Harley Tropin, Esq.
Represented By: Daniel C. Girard, Esq.
Represented By: Angelica M. Ornelas, Esq.
Represented By: Michael P. Bennett, Esq.
Represented By: Tal J. Lifshitz, Esq.
Represented By: Paul Aiello, Esq.
Represented By: Rachel Sullivan, Esq.
Represented By: Maia Aron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Calderwood
Represented By: Lisa B. Shelkrot, Esq.
Represented By: Harley Tropin, Esq.
Represented By: Daniel C. Girard, Esq.
Represented By: Angelica M. Ornelas, Esq.
Represented By: Michael P. Bennett, Esq.
Represented By: Tal J. Lifshitz, Esq.
Represented By: Paul Aiello, Esq.
Represented By: Rachel Sullivan, Esq.
Represented By: Maia Aron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose R. Casseres-Pinto
Represented By: Lisa B. Shelkrot, Esq.
Represented By: Harley Tropin, Esq.
Represented By: Daniel C. Girard, Esq.
Represented By: Angelica M. Ornelas, Esq.
Represented By: Michael P. Bennett, Esq.
Represented By: Tal J. Lifshitz, Esq.
Represented By: Paul Aiello, Esq.
Represented By: Rachel Sullivan, Esq.
Represented By: Maia Aron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Almasood Qureshi Alexandre Daccache
Represented By: Lisa B. Shelkrot, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Enrique Hiller Sanchez
Represented By: Lisa B. Shelkrot, Esq.
Represented By: Harley Tropin, Esq.
Represented By: Daniel C. Girard, Esq.
Represented By: Angelica M. Ornelas, Esq.
Represented By: Michael P. Bennett, Esq.
Represented By: Tal J. Lifshitz, Esq.
Represented By: Paul Aiello, Esq.
Represented By: Rachel Sullivan, Esq.
Represented By: Maia Aron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tongyi Wang
Represented By: Lisa B. Shelkrot, Esq.
Represented By: Harley Tropin, Esq.
Represented By: Daniel C. Girard, Esq.
Represented By: Angelica M. Ornelas, Esq.
Represented By: Michael P. Bennett, Esq.
Represented By: Tal J. Lifshitz, Esq.
Represented By: Paul Aiello, Esq.
Represented By: Rachel Sullivan, Esq.
Represented By: Maia Aron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Almasood Qureshi
Represented By: Lisa B. Shelkrot, Esq.
Represented By: Harley Tropin, Esq.
Represented By: Daniel C. Girard, Esq.
Represented By: Angelica M. Ornelas, Esq.
Represented By: Michael P. Bennett, Esq.
Represented By: Tal J. Lifshitz, Esq.
Represented By: Paul Aiello, Esq.
Represented By: Rachel Sullivan, Esq.
Represented By: Maia Aron, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: People's United Bank
Represented By: John J. Kennelly, Esq.
Represented By: James J. Stricker, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: People's United Financial, Inc.
Represented By: John J. Kennelly, Esq.
Represented By: James J. Stricker, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp, LLP
Represented By: Michael N. Donofrio, Esq.
Represented By: Bridget C. Asay, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David B. Gordon
Represented By: Michael N. Donofrio, Esq.
Represented By: Bridget C. Asay, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David B. Gordon, A Processional Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David B. Gordon, A Professional Corporation
Represented By: Michael N. Donofrio, Esq.
Represented By: Bridget C. Asay, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?