Bartshe v. Menard et al
Plaintiff: James Bartshe
Defendant: Marble Valley Regional Correctional Facility, Dr. Fischer, MD, Tom Giffin, Lisa Menard, CO Goodrich, Centurion of Vermont, LLC, Luana Tredwell, Vermont Department of Corrections, Hillary Hanson, Heidi Fox, Michael Lyons, Joshua Rutherford, Sup Hoague, Benjamin Watts, Ellen Casey, Goodrich and Fischer
Case Number: 2:2018cv00166
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: John M Conroy
Referring Judge: Christina Reiss
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATED DISCOVERY SCHEDULE/ORDER: Discovery due by 7/1/2019. Motions due by 8/1/2019. Ready for Trial by 10/1/2019. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 12/6/2018. (hbc)
December 6, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #13 Proposed Stipulated Discovery Schedule/Order filed by James Bartshe. The main document has been replaced as it was still in edit mode. The document is now attached to #13 and this entry. (law)
December 6, 2018 Filing 13 PROPOSED Stipulated Discovery Schedule/Order by James Bartshe. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Martin, Jill) (Main Document 13 replaced on 12/6/2018) (law).
November 8, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by Lisa Menard.(LaRose, Robert)
October 19, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen J. Soule, Esq, Pamela L.P. Eaton, Esq on behalf of Lisa Menard. (originally filed 10/9/2018 in state court) (law)
October 19, 2018 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Lisa Menard waiver sent on 9/12/2018, answer due 11/13/2018. (originally filed 10/4/2018 in state court) (law)
October 19, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jill Paul Martin, Esq on behalf of James Bartshe. (originally filed 9/17/2018 in state court) (law)
October 19, 2018 Filing 8 LETTER to Prisoner Rights' Office with copy of #5 Complaint. (originally filed 9/10/2018 in state court) (law)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Application to Waive Filings Fees and Services Costs. Signed by Court Clerk on 9/6/2018. (originally filed 9/6/2018 in state court) (law)
October 19, 2018 Filing 6 APPLICATION to Waive Filing Fees and Service Costs by James Bartshe. (originally filed 9/6/2018 in state court) (law)
October 19, 2018 Filing 5 COMPLAINT for Review of Governmental Action against Ellen Casey, Centurion of Vermont, LLC, Fischer, Heidi Fox, Tom Giffin, Goodrich, Hillary Hanson, Sup Hoague, Michael Lyons, Marble Valley Regional Correctional Facility, Lisa Menard, Joshua Rutherford, Luana Tredwell, Vermont Department of Corrections, Benjamin Watts filed by James Bartshe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5) (originally filed 8/23/2018 in state court) (law)
October 19, 2018 Filing 4 RECEIVED FILE and certified copy of docket sheet from State Court. (law)
October 15, 2018 Filing 3 LETTER to Vermont Superior Court, Civil Division, Washington Unit requesting original case file and certified docket sheet. (law)
October 15, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Lisa Menard. The JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet has been replaced to include additional case assignment information. The corrected JS-44 is now attached to #1 and this entry. (law)
October 12, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lisa Menard from Vermont Superior Court, Washington Unit, Civil Division, case number 500-9-18 Wncv. (Filing fee $ 400) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (hbc) (Attachment 5 replaced on 10/15/2018) (law).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bartshe v. Menard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marble Valley Regional Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Fischer, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Giffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Menard
Represented By: Pamela L.P. Eaton, Esq.
Represented By: Stephen J. Soule, Esq.
Represented By: Robert M. LaRose, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Goodrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centurion of Vermont, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luana Tredwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vermont Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hillary Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heidi Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Rutherford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sup Hoague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellen Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Bartshe
Represented By: Jill Paul Martin, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?