Conrad v. Brennan
Plaintiff: Jonathon D. Conrad
Defendant: Megan Brennan
Case Number: 2:2018cv00221
Filed: December 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: John M Conroy
Referring Judge: Christina Reiss
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2615
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE: Megan Brennan served on 1/14/2019, answer due 3/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (pac)
February 6, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Substitution by Owen C.J. Foster, AUSA as to Megan Brennan(Foster, Owen)
January 28, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE Regarding End of Lapse in Appropriations by Megan Brennan (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kerest, Nikolas)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #6 Unopposed Motion for a Stay of All Deadlines in Light of Lapse of Appropriations. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 1/24/2019. (This is a text-only Order.) (ejh)
January 16, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Stay All Deadlines In Light of Lapse in Appropriations filed by Megan Brennan. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kerest, Nikolas)
January 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nikolas P. Kerest, AUSA on behalf of Megan Brennan. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kerest, Nikolas)
December 27, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Reassignment pursuant to Local Rule 73(d). Case reassigned to Judge Christina Reiss. Judge John M. Conroy no longer assigned to the case. (law)
December 27, 2018 Filing 3 OBJECTION to Direct Assignment by Jonathon D. Conrad. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(law)
December 27, 2018 ISSUED Summons as to Megan Brennan, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (law)
December 26, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PRO SE APPEARANCE by Jonathon D. Conrad. (hbc)
December 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Megan Brennan filed by Jonathon D. Conrad. LR 73 Forms issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (eh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conrad v. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan Brennan
Represented By: Nikolas P. Kerest, AUSA
Represented By: Owen C.J. Foster, AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathon D. Conrad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?