In Re: Brookside Nursing Home

Plaintiff: Vermont Department of Disabilities Aging and Independent Living
Defendant: Brookside Nursing Home, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv00225
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Christina Reiss
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE Regarding End of Lapse of Appropriations by United States of America. (Torti, Julia)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Stay Case In Light of Lapse of Appropriations. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 1/22/2019. (law)
January 15, 2019 Filing 2 CONSENTED-TO MOTION to Stay the Case filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Torti, Julia)
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United States of America from Vermont Human Services Board, case number Fair Hearing No. 4-03/18-202. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Certificate of Service)(law)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Brookside Nursing Home
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brookside Nursing Home, Inc.
Represented By: Stuart Serota, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vermont Department of Disabilities Aging and Independent Living
Represented By: Laura A. Gans, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?