Ovian et al v. General Insurance Company of America et al

Plaintiff: Rosemarie Ovian and Matthew Ovian
Defendant: Progressive Northern Insurance Company and General Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 2:2018cv00229
Filed: December 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: William K Sessions
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel L. Burchard, Esq on behalf of Progressive Northern Insurance Company.(Burchard, Daniel)
February 15, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Progressive Northern Insurance Company.(Burchard, Daniel)
February 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #3 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Matthew Ovian, Rosemarie Ovian. The dates have been clarified to indicate that General Insurance Company of America waiver was sent on 1/24/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (law)
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: General Insurance Company of America waiver sent on 1/24/2019, answer due 3/25/2019.(Maley, John) Dates clarified on 2/14/2019 (law).
December 21, 2018 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Progressive Northern Insurance Company waiver sent on 12/19/2018, answer due 2/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Maley, Christopher)
December 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against General Insurance Company of America, Progressive Northern Insurance Company filed by Matthew Ovian, Rosemarie Ovian. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(law)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ovian et al v. General Insurance Company of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosemarie Ovian
Represented By: John P. Maley, Esq.
Represented By: Christopher J. Maley, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Ovian
Represented By: John P. Maley, Esq.
Represented By: Christopher J. Maley, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Northern Insurance Company
Represented By: Daniel L. Burchard, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?