Vermont Public Interest Research Group et al v. Wheeler et al

Plaintiff: Vermont Public Interest Research Group, Lauren Atkins, Safer Chemicals Healthy Families and Wendy Hartley
Defendant: Andrew Wheeler and United States Environmental Protection Agency
Case Number: 2:2019cv00009
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: John M Conroy
Referring Judge: William K Sessions
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Unopposed Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 3/14/2019. (This is a text-only Order.) (eae)
March 14, 2019 Filing 19 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Stay Case pending disposition of stipulated transfer to Southern District of New York filed by United States Environmental Protection Agency, Andrew Wheeler.(Carlisle, Benjamin)
February 20, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #16 Summons Returned Executed as to United States Environmental Protection Agency, #17 Summons Returned Executed as to Andrew Wheeler. The incorrect documents were uploaded at the time of filing. The correct documents are now attached to #16 , #17 , as well as this entry. (Attachments: #1 Document 17) (jlh)
February 19, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Andrew Wheeler (Service upon Atty General, Administrator of USEPA, and Regional Administrator of USEPA) (Griefen, Zachary) (Main Document 17 replaced on 2/20/2019) (jlh).
February 19, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: United States Environmental Protection Agency (Service upon Atty General, Administrator of USEPA, and Regional Administrator of USEPA) (Griefen, Zachary) (Main Document 16 replaced on 2/20/2019) (jlh)
February 15, 2019 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by Halogenated Solvents Industry Alliance, Inc. (Fawley, R.)
February 15, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Intervene filed by Halogenated Solvents Industry Alliance, Inc..(Fawley, R.)
February 10, 2019 Filing 13 OBJECTION to Direct Assignment by Lauren Atkins, Wendy Hartley, Safer Chemicals Healthy Families, Vermont Public Interest Research Group (Sussman, Robert) Text clarified on 2/11/2019 (law).
February 10, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by Safer Chemicals Healthy Families, Vermont Public Interest Research Group. (Sussman, Robert) Text/filers clarified on 2/11/2019 (law).
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 2/4/2019. (This is a text-only Order.) (eae)
February 4, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by United States Environmental Protection Agency, Andrew Wheeler.(Rosen, Perry)
February 4, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Benjamin Carlisle on behalf of United States Environmental Protection Agency, Andrew Wheeler.(Carlisle, Benjamin)
January 29, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Case Reassignment pursuant to Local Rule 73(d). Case reassigned to Judge William K. Sessions III. Judge John M. Conroy no longer assigned to the case. (law)
January 29, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Perry M. Rosen, Esq on behalf of United States Environmental Protection Agency, Andrew Wheeler.(Rosen, Perry)
January 28, 2019 Filing 6 OBJECTION to Direct Assignment by United States Environmental Protection Agency, Andrew Wheeler. (law)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Robert M. Sussman. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 1/23/2019. (This is a text-only Order.) (eh)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Robert M. Sussman filed by Lauren Atkins, Wendy Hartley, Safer Chemicals Healthy Families, Vermont Public Interest Research Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(law)
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed. United States Environmental Protection Agency served on 1/14/2019, answer due 3/15/2019. (eh)
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Andrew Wheeler served on 1/14/2019, answer due 3/15/2019. (eh)
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Wheeler, United States Environmental Protection Agency filed by Vermont Public Interest Research Group, Safer Chemicals Healthy Families, Wendy Hartley, Lauren Atkins. Summonses issued. LR 73 Forms issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (eh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vermont Public Interest Research Group et al v. Wheeler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Wheeler
Represented By: Nikolas P. Kerest, AUSA
Represented By: Benjamin Carlisle
Represented By: Perry M. Rosen, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Environmental Protection Agency
Represented By: Nikolas P. Kerest, AUSA
Represented By: Benjamin Carlisle
Represented By: Perry M. Rosen, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vermont Public Interest Research Group
Represented By: Robert M. Sussman, Esq.
Represented By: Zachary K. Griefen, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Atkins
Represented By: Robert M. Sussman, Esq.
Represented By: Zachary K. Griefen, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Safer Chemicals Healthy Families
Represented By: Robert M. Sussman, Esq.
Represented By: Zachary K. Griefen, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Hartley
Represented By: Robert M. Sussman, Esq.
Represented By: Zachary K. Griefen, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?