Rivers v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Ashley M. Rivers
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2019cv00023
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Christina Reiss
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:1383
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #5 Affidavit of Service filed by Ashley M. Rivers. Docket text has been corrected to indicate Commissioner of Social Security served on 2/21/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (jlh)
March 6, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Ashley M. Rivers. Commissioner of Social Security served on 2/21/2019, answer due 4/22/2019 (Attachments: #1 Return receipts)(Anderson, Arthur) Dates corrected on 3/8/2019 (jlh).
February 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Benil Abraham, SAUSA on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security.(Abraham, Benil)
February 14, 2019 ISSUED Summons as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (pac)
February 12, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Ashley M. Rivers. (jbr)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER GRANTING #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 2/12/2019. (This is a text-only Order.) (ejh)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis filed by Ashley M. Rivers. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Ashley Rivers, #2 Affidavit of Net Worth, #3 Proposed Complaint (sealed), #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (pac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rivers v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Benil Abraham, SAUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley M. Rivers
Represented By: Arthur P. Anderson, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?