Steward Ownership Trust, Inc. v. Lorentz Etc., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Steward Ownership Trust, Inc.
Defendant: Lorentz Etc., Inc., American Arbitration Association and La Jeune Lune Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00026
Filed: February 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Christina Reiss
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ENTRY ORDER REMANDING CASE to the Vermont Superior Court. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 4/4/2019. (pac)
March 25, 2019 Filing 32 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Christina Reiss: Motion Hearing held on 3/25/2019 re #18 MOTION to Remand to State Court, #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Michael Hanley, Esq., present for pltf. Craig Miller, Esq., Kendall Hoechst, Esq., present for dft Lorentz, Etc., Inc. Erin Miller Heins, Esq., and Peter Langrock, Esq., present for dft La Juene Lune Holdings. Court makes inquiries. Statements by counsel. ORDERED: granting #18 MOTION for Remand to State Court. Court will issue a Remand Order. Court will not award attorneys fees and costs. Court will not address #8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction as case is remanded to State Court. (Court Reporter: Anne Pierce) (jbr)
March 22, 2019 Filing 31 REVISED NOTICE of Hearing re: #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and #18 MOTION to Remand to State Court. Motion Hearing set for 3/25/2019 at 3:00 PM in Burlington Courtroom 542 before Judge Christina Reiss. (revised to add Motion to Remand to schedule) (pac)
March 21, 2019 Filing 30 RESPONSE in Opposition re #27 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Related to Arbitration Pending This Court's Determination of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by Lorentz Etc., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard Dion Farganis, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Clark, Angela)
March 15, 2019 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re: #20 Motion to Compel Arbitration and, MOTION to Dismiss or, MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Arbitration by Steward Ownership Trust, Inc. (Perkins, Paul)
March 15, 2019 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM in Support re: #27 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Related to Arbitration Pending This Court's Determination of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by Steward Ownership Trust, Inc. (Perkins, Paul)
March 15, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Related to Arbitration Pending This Court's Determination of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by Steward Ownership Trust, Inc.(Perkins, Paul)
March 12, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter F. Langrock, Esq on behalf of La Jeune Lune Holdings, LLC.(Langrock, Peter)
March 8, 2019 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Lorentz Etc., Inc.. (Clark, Angela)
March 7, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Erin Miller Heins, Esq on behalf of La Jeune Lune Holdings, LLC.(Heins, Erin)
March 6, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Hearing re: #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Motion Hearing set for 3/25/2019 at 03:00 PM in Burlington Courtroom 542 before Judge Christina Reiss.(jbr)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING #17 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Craig P. Miller, Esq. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 3/5/2019. (This is a text-only Order.) (ejh)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING #16 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Richard D. Farganis, Esq. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 3/5/2019. (This is a text-only Order.) (ejh)
March 1, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and MOTION to Dismiss or MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Arbitration filed by Lorentz Etc., Inc.(Hoechst, Kendall). Added MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Stay on 3/4/2019 (law).
March 1, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re: #20 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and MOTION to Dismiss or MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Arbitration filed by Lorentz Etc., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Lorentz, #2 Index of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J)(Hoechst, Kendall) Link added on 3/4/2019 (law).
March 1, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Steward Ownership Trust, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Hanley, Michael) Event/Text clarified on 3/5/2019 (jlh).
February 25, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Hearing Cancellation. (originally filed 2/14/2019 in state court)(pac)
February 25, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Filing #1 Notice of Removal by Lorentz Etc., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Certificate of Service)(originally filed 2/13/2019 in state court) (pac)
February 25, 2019 Filing 13 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE. Lorentz Etc., Inc. served on 2/11/2019, answer due 3/4/2019. (originally filed 2/11/2019 in state court) (pac)
February 25, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Hearing re: #8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (originally filed 2/1/2019 in state court) (pac)
February 25, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Hearing re #8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (originally filed 2/1/2019 in state court) (pac)
February 25, 2019 Filing 10 RECEIPT of Payment. (originally filed 1/30/2019 in state court) (pac)
February 25, 2019 Filing 9 ENTRY REGARDING #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Michael R. Kainen on 1/30/2019. (originally filed 1/30/2019 in state court) (pac)
February 25, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Steward Ownership Trust, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Notice of Hearing)(originally filed 1/30/2019 in state court) (pac)
February 25, 2019 Filing 7 COMPLAINT against American Arbitration Association, La Jeune Lune Holdings, LLC, Lorentz Etc., Inc. filed by Steward Ownership Trust, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Jury Demand)(originally filed 1/29/2019 in state court) (pac)
February 25, 2019 Filing 6 RECEIVED FILE and certified copy of docket sheet from State Court. (pac)
February 22, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Craig P. Miller filed by Lorentz Etc., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Craig P. Miller, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(jlh)
February 22, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Richard D. Farganis filed by Lorentz Etc., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Richard D. Farganis, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(jlh)
February 22, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION by Steward Ownership Trust, Inc. (Perkins, Paul)
February 22, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: La Jeune Lune Holdings, LLC waiver sent on 2/21/2019, answer due 4/22/2019.(Perkins, Paul)
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER to VT Superior Court, Windsor Unit, Civil Division requesting certified docket sheet and original file. (pac)
February 13, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by Lorentz Etc., Inc. (pac)
February 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lorentz Etc., Inc. from VT Superior Court, Windsor Unit, Civil Division, 32-1-19 Wrcv. ( Filing fee $ 400) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit B, #11 Exhibit C, #12 Exhibit D, #13 Exhibit E, #14 Civil Cover Sheet) (pac) State court case number added on 2/14/2019 (law).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steward Ownership Trust, Inc. v. Lorentz Etc., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorentz Etc., Inc.
Represented By: Craig P. Miller, Esq.
Represented By: Dion Farganis, Esq.
Represented By: Kendall A. Hoechst, Esq.
Represented By: Richard D. Farganis, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Arbitration Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: La Jeune Lune Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Erin Miller Heins, Esq.
Represented By: Peter F. Langrock, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steward Ownership Trust, Inc.
Represented By: Michael F. Hanley, Esq.
Represented By: Paul J. Perkins, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?