Johnston v. Yennerell et al

Plaintiff: Douglas Johnston
Defendant: Tom Yennerell and Springfield, Vermont, Town of
Case Number: 2:2019cv00030
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Christina Reiss
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Springfield, Vermont, Town of waiver sent on 3/8/2019, answer due 5/7/2019.(Lynn, Pietro)
March 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian P. Monaghan, Esq on behalf of Springfield, Vermont, Town of.(Monaghan, Brian)
March 6, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Springfield, Vermont, Town of served on 2/25/2019, answer due 3/18/2019.(Lynn, Pietro)
March 6, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Tom Yennerell served on 2/25/2019, answer due 5/2/2019.(Lynn, Pietro)
March 6, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Tom Yennerell waiver sent on 3/3/2019, answer due 5/2/2019.(Lynn, Pietro)
March 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Philip C. Woodward, Esq on behalf of Tom Yennerell. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Woodward, Philip)
February 21, 2019 ISSUED Summons as to Springfield, Vermont, Town of; Tom Yennerell.(kac)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Town of Springfield, Vermont, Tom Yennerell filed by Douglas Johnston. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (pac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnston v. Yennerell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Yennerell
Represented By: Philip C. Woodward, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Springfield, Vermont, Town of
Represented By: Brian P. Monaghan, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Johnston
Represented By: Pietro J. Lynn, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?