Patriot Insurance Company et al v. Biddeford Blankets, LLC
Plaintiff: Linda Lewis and Patriot Insurance Company
Defendant: Biddeford Blankets, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00077
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Christina Reiss
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #3 Motion of Erick J. Kirker, Esq. for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 7/8/2019. (This is a text-only Order.) (ejh)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Erick J. Kirker filed by Linda Lewis, Patriot Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Erick J. Kirker, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(jlh)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Patriot Insurance Company. Biddeford Blankets, LLC served on 5/28/2019, answer due 6/18/2019 (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Wright, Kristin)
May 20, 2019 ISSUED Summons as to Biddeford Blankets, LLC.(gmg)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Biddeford Blankets, LLC filed by Patriot Insurance Company, Linda Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (pac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patriot Insurance Company et al v. Biddeford Blankets, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Lewis
Represented By: Thomas C. Bixby, Esq.
Represented By: Kristin C. Wright, Esq.
Represented By: Erick J. Kirker, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patriot Insurance Company
Represented By: Kristin C. Wright, Esq.
Represented By: Barbara R. Blackman, Esq.
Represented By: Erick J. Kirker, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biddeford Blankets, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?