Hall et al v. Canney
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Hall and Scot Hall
Defendant: John R. Canney, III
Case Number: 2:2019cv00079
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Christina Reiss
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE to #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Elizabeth Hall, Scot Hall. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Certificate of Service)(Bixby, Thomas)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by John R. Canney, III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Certificate of Service)(McPhee, Rodney)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rodney E. McPhee, Esq on behalf of John R. Canney, III. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(McPhee, Rodney)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #2 Summons Returned Executed. Docket text has been corrected to read: John R. Cannery, III served on 5/29/2019, answer due 6/19/2019 (jlh)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed.John R. Canney, III served on 5/29/2019, answer due 6/19/2019.(Bixby, Thomas) Dates clarified on 6/6/2019 (jlh).
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John R. Canney, III filed by Scot Hall, Elizabeth Hall. Summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (pac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall et al v. Canney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Hall
Represented By: Thomas C. Bixby, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scot Hall
Represented By: Thomas C. Bixby, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John R. Canney, III
Represented By: Rodney E. McPhee, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?