Acosta v. Mama Battaglia's Pizzeria, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: R. Alexander Acosta
Defendant: Henry's Diner, William Maglaris, Mama Battaglia's Pizzeria, Inc. and Naomi Maglaris
Case Number: 2:2019cv00099
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: William K Sessions
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:206
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #3 Consent Judgement and Order. The document was in edit mode and has been replaced on the docket. The corrected document is now attached to #3 as well as this entry. (jlh)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CONSENT JUDGMENT AND ORDER granting #2 Joint Motion to Approve Consent Judgment. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 6/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (jam) (Main Document 3 replaced on 6/12/2019) (jlh).
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 JOINT MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment and proposed Order filed by R. Alexander Acosta. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Consent Judgment and Order, #2 Exhibit A)(Butler, Marjorie)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Henry's Diner, Naomi Maglaris, William Maglaris, Mama Battaglia's Pizzeria, Inc. filed by R. Alexander Acosta. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(law)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acosta v. Mama Battaglia's Pizzeria, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry's Diner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Maglaris
Represented By: Leo P. O'Reilly, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mama Battaglia's Pizzeria, Inc.
Represented By: Leo P. O'Reilly, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Naomi Maglaris
Represented By: Leo P. O'Reilly, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. Alexander Acosta
Represented By: Paul Spanos, Esq.
Represented By: Marjorie A. Butler, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?