Salutare Foods, LLC v. Half Baked Foods, LLC
Plaintiff: Salutare Foods, LLC
Defendant: Half Baked Foods, LLC and Half Baked, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00104
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: William K Sessions
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #6 Summons Returned Executed. The docket entry has been clarified as to party served: Half Baked Foods served on 7/30/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. (law)
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Half Baked Foods served on 7/30/2019, answer due 8/20/2019.(Bell, Alison) Party served corrected on 8/6/2019 (law).
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of D. Benham Kirk. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 7/10/2019. (This is a text-only Order.) (eae)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of D. Behnam Kirk filed by Salutare Foods, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Affidavit of D. Benham Kirk)(jlh)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Breach of Contract against Half Baked, LLC filed by Salutare Foods, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit a, #3 Exhibit b, #4 Exhibit c, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit a, #9 Exhibit b, #10 Redlined Version)(jam)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by Salutare Foods, LLC (Bell, Alison)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Breach of Contract against Half Baked Foods, LLC filed by Salutare Foods, LLC. Summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 exhibit a, #3 exhibit b, #4 exhibit c, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 exhibit a, #9 exhibit b, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(law)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salutare Foods, LLC v. Half Baked Foods, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salutare Foods, LLC
Represented By: Alison J. Bell
Represented By: D. Benham Kirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Half Baked Foods, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Half Baked, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?