Russin v. State of Vermont et al
Plaintiff: Dennis Russin
Defendant: Mike Touchette, Greg Hale, Matt Brouillette, Corey Weikel, State of Vermont and Antonio Bond
Case Number: 2:2019cv00105
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: John M Conroy
Referring Judge: Christina Reiss
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Dennis Russin. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Adam Waite (unredacted, sealed), #2 Notice to Adam Waite (redacted), #3 Inmate Request Form, #4 Mail Log) (eh)
July 23, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Corey Weikel (individual capacity) waiver sent on 7/2/2019, answer due 9/3/2019.(eh)
July 19, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #7 Waiver of Service Returned Executed as to Mike Touchette. The document was incomplete and has been replaced on the docket. The corrected document is now attached to #7 as well as this entry. (jlh)
July 17, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Antonio Bond (individual and official capacity) waiver sent on 7/2/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (eh)
July 17, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Corey Weikel (official capacity) waiver sent on 7/2/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (eh) Text clarified on 7/23/2019 (eh).
July 17, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Matt Brouillette (individual and official capacity) waiver sent on 7/2/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (eh)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Greg Hale (individual and official capacity) waiver sent on 7/2/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (eh)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Mike Touchette (individual and official capacity) waiver sent on 7/2/2019, answer due 9/3/2019.(eh) (Main Document 7 replaced on 7/18/2019) (jlh).
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: State of Vermont waiver sent on 7/2/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (eh)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jared C. Bianchi, Esq on behalf of Antonio Bond, Matt Brouillette, Greg Hale, State of Vermont, Mike Touchette, Corey Weikel. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bianchi, Jared)
July 2, 2019 ISSUED Waivers as to Antonio Bond, Matt Brouillette, Greg Hale, State of Vermont, Mike Touchette, Corey Weikel. (hbc)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Antonio Bond, Matt Brouillette, Greg Hale, State of Vermont, Mike Touchette, Corey Weikel filed by Dennis Russin. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Dennis Russin, #2 Affidavit of Ira Flowers, #3 Affidavit of Tyson Wells, #4 Grievances) (hbc)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from the prison account of Dennis Russin. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 6/28/2019. (law)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 6/28/2019. (law)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis filed by Dennis Russin. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Dennis Russin, #2 Proposed Complaint (sealed), #3 Notice of Pro Se Appearance, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(law)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Russin v. State of Vermont et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Touchette
Represented By: Jared C. Bianchi, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Hale
Represented By: Jared C. Bianchi, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Brouillette
Represented By: Jared C. Bianchi, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corey Weikel
Represented By: Jared C. Bianchi, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Vermont
Represented By: Jared C. Bianchi, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonio Bond
Represented By: Jared C. Bianchi, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Russin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?