McKee v. Azar
Plaintiff: Beth McKee
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II
Case Number: 2:2019cv00114
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Christina Reiss
Nature of Suit: Social Security: HIA
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY REMOVAL: Document 9 has been removed from the case as entered in error. (law)
August 8, 2019 Filing 9 Entry removed from docket.
July 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #7 Summons Returned Executed as to USA. The dates have been clarified to show: Alex M. Azar, II served on 7/8/2019, answer due 9/6/2019. (law)
July 26, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Alex M. Azar, II served on 7/8/2019, answer due 9/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Return Receipts, #2 Certificate of Service)(Miller, Emily) Dates clarified on 7/26/2019 (law)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion of Wey-Wey Kwok, Esq. and Alice Bers, Esq. for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 7/18/2019. (This is a text-only Order.) (ejh)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Wey-Wey Kwok and Alice Bers filed by Beth McKee. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Wey-Wey Kwok, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Affidavit of Alice Bers, #4 Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Proposed Order)(law)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable re: 3 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Mail sent to Emily K. Miller, Esq. (Attachments: #1 Document 3) (pac)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 7/2/2019. (This is a text-only Order.) (ejh)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis filed by Beth McKee. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Beth McKee) (pac)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alex M. Azar, II filed by Beth McKee. Summonses issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (pac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKee v. Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beth McKee
Represented By: Michael Kelly Benvenuto
Represented By: Alice Bers, Esq.
Represented By: Emily K. Miller, Esq.
Represented By: Wey-Wey Kwok, Esq.
Represented By: Michael K. Benvenuto, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?