Weatherford v. University of Vermont
Plaintiff: Lori Meredith Weatherford
Defendant: University of Vermont
Case Number: 2:2019cv00117
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: William K Sessions
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 8 JUDGMENT - this case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 7/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Litigants (appeal period expires 8/19/2019))(jam)
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 COMPLAINT against University of Vermont filed by Lori Meredith Weatherford. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jam)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 OPINION AND ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. the claims in this case are DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(I). The Court hereby certifies that any appeal would not be taken in good faith pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3). Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 7/18/2019. (jam)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Durable Financial Power of Attorney by Lori Meredith Weatherford.(jam)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Vermont Power of Attorney for Health Care by Lori Meredith Weatherford.(jam)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Revocation of Power of Attorney by Lori Meredith Weatherford.(jam)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PRO SE APPEARANCE by Lori Meredith Weatherford.(jam)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis filed by Lori Meredith Weatherford. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Lori Meredith Weatherford, #2 Proposed Complaint (image is sealed), #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(jam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weatherford v. University of Vermont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Vermont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Meredith Weatherford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?