Smith v. Brennan
Plaintiff: Stephen L. Smith
Defendant: Megan J. Brennan
Case Number: 2:2019cv00123
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: Christina Reiss
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 ISSUED Summons as to Megan J. Brennan, U.S. Postal Service, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General.(law)
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Megan J. Brennan filed by Stephen L. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint (Red Lined Version), #2 Notice, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (pac)
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #2 Affidavit of Service filed by Stephen L. Smith. The main document has been replaced as it was still in edit mode. The return receipts were combined into one document. The receipts have been broken apart and replaced on the docket. The main document and return receipts are now separately attached to #2 and this entry. Also, the answer due date has been corrected to show: Megan J. Brennan answer due 9/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Return Receipt as to U.S. Attorney General, #2 Return Receipt as to U.S. Attorney's Office, #3 Return Receipt as to Postmaster, United States Postal Service) (law)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Stephen L. Smith. Megan J. Brennan served on 7/30/2019, answer due 9/30/2019 (Attachments: #1 Return Receipt as to U.S. Attorney General)(Watts, Jr., Norman) (Answer date clarified, Main Document and Attachment 2 replaced , Additional attachment(s) added on 8/7/2019: #2 Return Receipt as to U.S. Attorney's Office, #3 Return Receipt as to Postmaster, United States Postal Service) (law).
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Megan J. Brennan filed by Stephen L. Smith. Summonses issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (pac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan J. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen L. Smith
Represented By: Norman E. Watts, Jr., Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?