Fuller v. Touchette et al
Plaintiff: Bruce Lester Fuller
Defendant: Michael Touchette, Centurion Medical Services and Michael Lyons
Case Number: 2:2019cv00125
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Vermont
Presiding Judge: John M Conroy
Referring Judge: Christina Reiss
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #7 Complaint filed by Bruce Lester Fuller. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2)(law)
August 15, 2019 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Michael Lyons (individual and official capacities) waiver sent on 8/13/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (eh)
August 15, 2019 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Michael Touchette (individual and official capacities) waiver sent on 8/13/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (eh)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Centurion Medical Services answer due 9/16/2019. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 8/15/2019. (This is a text-only Order.) (eh)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying #9 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 8/14/2019. (hbc)
August 13, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen J. Soule, Esq on behalf of Centurion Medical Services.(Soule, Stephen)
August 13, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #7 Complaint filed by Centurion Medical Services.(Eaton, Pamela)
August 13, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Pamela L.P. Eaton, Esq on behalf of Centurion Medical Services.(Eaton, Pamela)
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Bruce Lester Fuller. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Declaration of Bruce Lester Fuller) (eh)
July 25, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Centurion Medical Services served on 7/23/2019, answer due 8/13/2019. (eh)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 REISSUED Waivers as to Michael Lyons, Michael Touchette. (eh) Text Clarified on 7/19/2019 (eh).
July 17, 2019 ISSUED Summons as to Centurion Medical Services. (eh)
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 COMPLAINT against Centurion Medical Services, Michael Lyons, Michael Touchette filed by Bruce Lester Fuller. Waivers issued as to Michael Touchette and Michael Lyons. (eh)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from the prison account of Bruce Lester Fuller. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 7/16/2019. (eh)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 7/16/2019. (eh)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY REMOVAL. Document 3 has been removed from the docket as entered in error. (jlh)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 Entry has been removed from the docket.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fuller v. Touchette et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Lester Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Touchette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centurion Medical Services
Represented By: Pamela L.P. Eaton, Esq.
Represented By: Stephen J. Soule, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?